Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2020 at 06:03:59 (UTC).

Victor Reyes, Jr. v. K. Marino, et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Victor Reyes, Jr filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against K Marino. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17341

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

CITY OF GLENDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT

Defendant / Appellees

K. BICKEL, #9545 Public Officer, City of Glendale Police Department

M. RENTROPE

H. STEWARD, #11806 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

G. ARNOLD, #1462 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

R. SOLIS, #13410 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

ROMAN, #17602 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

T. PSALIDAS, #15581 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

M. LOWE, #12419 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

L. TERRELL, #17789 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

C. THRASHER, Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

K. HORNBAKER, #17072 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

HUNT

N. LOESCHE, #13411 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

ROWE, #17074 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

J. SMITH, #13699 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

BEHRENS, #13075 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

ANSELL, #17089 Public Officer, City of Glendale P.D.

K. MARINO, 17930

T. DARBY, #09969 Public Officer, City of Glendale Police Department

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Victor Reyes Jr.

5003 W. Ruth Ave.

Glendale, AZ 85302

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Victor Reyes, Jr. motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/26/2019. [11530781] (JFF) [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:30 PM]

#3

(#3) Filed Appellant Victor Reyes, Jr. motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/26/2019. [11530769] (JFF) [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:26 PM]

1 #3

Pro Se Case Information Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Victor Reyes, Jr. motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/26/2019. [11530781] (JFF) [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Victor Reyes, Jr. motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/26/2019. [11530769] (JFF) [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • (#2) Mail returned on 12/09/2019 addressed to Victor Reyes, Jr. at #260920, ASPC-Eyman, PO Box 4000, Florence, AZ 85132, re: 11/19/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: not at ASPC-Eyman/inactive, return to sender, unable to forward. Resending to: case files; appellant was released from custody on 10/25/2019 per AZ inmate database, case opening mail was also sent to appellant's most recent known address at 5003 W. Ruth Ave., Glendale, AZ 85302. [11527826] (LA) [Entered: 12/10/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Victor Reyes Jr. opening brief due 01/14/2020. (No appearance for Appellees, no answering brief deadlines set) [11503847] (HC) [Entered: 11/19/2019 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hunt is a litigant