This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/13/2022 at 06:04:59 (UTC).

Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. State of Texas

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Victim Rights Law Center filed an Other lawsuit against State of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1445

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Interested Party

FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION

Defendant

NATHANIEL R. MENDELL, US Attorney

Interested Parties

LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS

WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION

ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES

GLSEN

NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY

NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE

LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW

JANA'S CAMPAIGN, INC.

AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM

ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU)

FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS

AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK

VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER

CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER

STATE OF TEXAS

COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES

Defendant / Appellee

SUZANNE B. GOLDBERG, in her official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights

Plaintiff / Appellees and Interested Parties

VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER

JILL DOE

128 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

David Hinojosa

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K St Nw, 9Th Flr

Washington, DC 20005

Geoffrey B. Kehlmann

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Lauren A. Khouri

Attorney at Correia & Puth PLLC

1400 16Th St Nw, Ste 450

Washington, DC 20036

Kenneth B. Walton

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

1 International Pl, 3Rd Flr

Boston, MA 02110

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Rebecca M. Kopplin

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sunu P. Chandy

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nw, Ste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Caitlin A. Crujido

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Emily Martin

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nw, Ste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Julie G. O'Neill

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Robin A. Smith

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Vanshika Vij

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Other Attorneys

Saul E. Wolf

Attorney at Manly Stewart & Finaldi

19100 Von Karman Ave, Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Paige Duggins-Clay

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Ave, Ste 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Allen F. James

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

4801 Main St, Ste 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

Lisa N. Cloutier

Attorney at The Fierberg National Law Group

161 E Front St, Ste 200

Traverse City, MI 496484

Daniel Tingley

Attorney at Harris Wiltshire & Grannis LLP

1919 M St Nw, 8Th Flr

Washington, DC 20036

Cynthia P. Garrett

Attorney at Families Advocating for Campus Equality

3 West George St, Po Box 71

Batesville, IN 47006-9998

Naomi M. Mann

Attorney at Boston University Law School

765 Commonwealth Ave

Boston, MA 02215

Matthew S. Shapanka

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 10Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Cari S. Simon

Attorney at The Fierberg National Law Group, PLLC

1701 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20006

43 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Lisa N. Cloutier for Not Parties Jane Doe, Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford. Copy of notice issued November 4, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [21-1445] (ATC) [Entered: 12/17/2021 04:10 PM]

Open Document

ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. The movant-appellant's Unopposed Motion to Abate the Appeal is granted. The movant-appellant shall promptly notify the court upon resolution of the merits appeals whether it wishes to pursue this appeal. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 12/02/2021 11:46 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford. [21-1777] (GAK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 11:03 AM]

Open Document

REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Cynthia E. Tobisman for Not Parties Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. Certificate of service was not included. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:34 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. [21-1445, 21-1773, 21-1777, 21-1782, 21-1783, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 12:30 PM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Lisa N. Cloutier for Not Parties Jane Doe, Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford. Copy of notice issued November 4, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [21-1445] (ATC) [Entered: 12/17/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge. The movant-appellant's Unopposed Motion to Abate the Appeal is granted. The movant-appellant shall promptly notify the court upon resolution of the merits appeals whether it wishes to pursue this appeal. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 12/02/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow: 11/12/2020, TRO Bench Trial. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1445, 21-1773, 21-1777, 21-1782, 21-1783, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 11/23/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford. [21-1777] (GAK) [Entered: 11/16/2021 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. [21-1445, 21-1773, 21-1777, 21-1782, 21-1783, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Cynthia E. Tobisman for Not Parties Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. Certificate of service was not included. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse. [21-1777] (GAK) [Entered: 10/20/2021 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse. [21-1777] (GAK) [Entered: 10/15/2021 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNOPPOSED MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellant State of Texas. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2021. [21-1445] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (LCP) [Entered: 10/12/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and/appendix filed by Appellant State of Texas. Brief and appendix due 10/29/2021 for appellant State of Texas. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 09/28/2021 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Lisa N. Cloutier for Not Party Survivors of Sexual Violence. Certificate of service was not included. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 07/07/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 07/16/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Kathleen T. Hunker for State of Texas, Sunu P. Chandy for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, Kristin M. Knuuttila for California Women's Law Center, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Amy Poyer for California Women's Law Center, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 07/02/2021 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFiling fee was paid in the district court by Appellant State of Texas on 06/17/2021. [21-1445] (GAK) [Entered: 06/24/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel Angel Cardona, Suzanne B. Goldberg and US Department of Education filed by Attorney Stephanie R. Marcus. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2021. [21-1445] (SRM) [Entered: 06/23/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant State of Texas. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2021. [21-1445] (LCP) [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant State of Texas filed by Attorney Lanora C. Pettit. Certificate of service dated 06/21/2021. [21-1445] (LCP) [Entered: 06/21/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center filed by Attorney Michael F. Qian. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2021. [21-1445] (MQ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jane Doe, Susan Doe, Anne Doe, Jill Doe, Sobia Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center, Legal Voice, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe filed by Attorney James R. Sigel. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2021. [21-1445] (JRS) [Entered: 06/17/2021 05:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPublic docket note: Merrick Garland was sworn in as Attorney General of the United States on March 11, 2021. We have substituted him for William P. Barr, as the defendant. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). Miguel Angel Cardona was named United States Secretary of Education as of March 1, 2021. We have substituted him for Betsy DeVos, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). Nathaniel Mendell was named Acting United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts as of March 1, 2021. We have substituted him for Andrew Lelling, as the defendant. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). Suzanne Goldberg was named Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights on January 22, 2021. We have substituted her for Kimberly Richey, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [21-1445] (DPO) [Entered: 06/11/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #177) filed by Appellant State of Texas. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Fee due 06/25/2021. [21-1445] (DPO) [Entered: 06/11/2021 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY is a litigant

Latest cases where FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION INC. is a litigant