This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/24/2021 at 06:12:08 (UTC).

Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Families Advocating for Campus Equality

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Victim Rights Law Center filed an Other lawsuit against Families Advocating for Campus Equality. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1784

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Plaintiff / Appellees

CHICAGO ALLIANCE AGAINST SEXUAL EXPLOITATION

ANNE DOE

JANE DOE, an individual by and through her mother and next friend Melissa White

JILL DOE

LISA DOE

NANCY DOE

SOBIA DOE

SUSAN DOE

VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER

LEGAL VOICE

EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES

Plaintiff / Appellees, Interested Parties and Plaintiffs

VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER

JOHN DOE

STEVE DOE

ZACHARY DOE

LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO

Defendant / Appellees

MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA, in his official capacity as Secretary of Education

SUZANNE B. GOLDBERG, in her official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights

US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

131 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Sunu P. Chandy

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nwste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Neena Chaudhry

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nwste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Caitlin A. Crujido

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Evan M. Harris

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Emily Martin

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nwste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

David A. Newman

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Julie G. O'Neill

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Shiwali G. Patel

Attorney at National Women's Law Center

11 Dupont Cir, Nwste 800

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Michael Qian

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

James Reid Sigel

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market St

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Robin A. Smith

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Elizabeth Tang

1355 17Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Vanshika Vij

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nwste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer B. Dickey

Attorney at US Chamber of Commerce

1615 H St Nw

Washington, DC 20062-0000

Rebecca M. Kopplin

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Wayste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

Steven A. Myers

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jennifer Mascott

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Interested Party Attorney

Douglas Scott Brooks

Attorney at Libby Hoopes Brooks PC

399 Boylston Stste 600

Boston, MA 02116

48 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Justin Dillon. Served on 12/23/2021. [21-1784] (JD) [Entered: 12/23/2021 09:55 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Christopher C. Muha. Served on 12/22/2021. [21-1784] (CCM) [Entered: 12/22/2021 02:18 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1784, 21-1853. [21-1784, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:32 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6464067-2 ]. Served on 12/21/2021. [21-1784] (CCM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:09 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of order issued December 7, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 12/17/2021 04:21 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of notice issued December 1, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:27 AM]

Open Document

ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 12/21/2021. [21-1784] (GAK) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:33 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 12/15/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sarah R. Fink for Families Advocating for Campus Equality and John Doe, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Sarah R. Fink for John Doe, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1784, Sarah R. Fink for John Doe, Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1853. [21-1784, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:38 PM]

Open Document

Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued October 25, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 11/17/2021 03:39 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel Angel Cardona, Suzanne B. Goldberg and US Department of Education filed by Attorney Stephanie R. Marcus. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (SRM) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:36 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe and Susan Doe filed by Attorney Michael F. Qian. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MQ) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:28 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jill Doe, Anne Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Legal Voice, Jane Doe and Victim Rights Law Center filed by Attorney James R. Sigel. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JRS) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:25 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:13 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:10 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Douglas S. Brooks. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:09 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Justin Dillon. Served on 12/23/2021. [21-1784] (JD) [Entered: 12/23/2021 09:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Christopher C. Muha. Served on 12/22/2021. [21-1784] (CCM) [Entered: 12/22/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1784, 21-1853. [21-1784, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 12/21/2021 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6464067-2 ]. Served on 12/21/2021. [21-1784] (CCM) [Entered: 12/21/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of order issued December 7, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 12/17/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of notice issued December 1, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 12/16/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 12/21/2021. [21-1784] (GAK) [Entered: 12/07/2021 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 12/15/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Sarah R. Fink for Families Advocating for Campus Equality and John Doe, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Sarah R. Fink for John Doe, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1784, Sarah R. Fink for John Doe, Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Steve Doe and Zachary Doe, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Nicole Antoine for Members of Congress, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Amy Poyer for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., Victim Rights Law Center, AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Scott Schneider for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Tyler Starr for Members of Congress, Daniel Tingley for Law Professors, Katharine K. Baker, Joanna L. Grossman, Jonathan Weinberg, Michael J. Wishnie, Nicole Huberfeld, Samuel R. Bagenstos, Naomi M. Mann, Daniel Hemel, Jon Michaels, Blake Emerson, Deborah L. Brake, Nancy Cantalupo, Erin Buzuvis, David S. Cohen, Ann McGinley, Ruben Garcia, David Oppenheimer, Jodi Short, David A. Super, Ian Ayres, Robert S. Chang, Hannah Brenner Johnson, Michele Dauber, Daniel Taylor Deacon, Sally Goldfarb, Julie Goldscheid and Victoria F. Nourse, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford in 21-1853. [21-1784, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 12/01/2021 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Appellants Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued October 25, 2021. Forwarded to Families Advocating for Campus Equality HQ 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1784] (ATC) [Entered: 11/17/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel Angel Cardona, Suzanne B. Goldberg and US Department of Education filed by Attorney Stephanie R. Marcus. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (SRM) [Entered: 11/08/2021 06:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe and Susan Doe filed by Attorney Michael F. Qian. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MQ) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Jill Doe, Anne Doe, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Legal Voice, Jane Doe and Victim Rights Law Center filed by Attorney James R. Sigel. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (JRS) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality filed by Attorney Douglas S. Brooks. Certificate of service dated 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (DSB) [Entered: 11/08/2021 02:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #202) filed by Appellant Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 11/08/2021. [21-1784] (GAK) [Entered: 10/25/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN is a litigant

Latest cases where Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation is a litigant