This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/19/2022 at 06:35:47 (UTC).

Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Found. for Indiv. Rgts in Edu., et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Victim Rights Law Center filed an Other lawsuit against Found for Indiv Rgts in Edu . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1748

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Interested Parties

LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS

WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION

ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES

NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY

NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE

LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW

AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM

ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU)

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS

AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK

GLSEN

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES

COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES

NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS

TEN MEN - RHODE ISLAND COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (URMIA)

Petitioner / Appellants

SPEECH FIRST, INC.

INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER

Plaintiff / Appellees

VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER

JILL DOE

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

David Hinojosa

Attorney at Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

1500 K St Nw, 9Th Flr

Washington, DC 20005

Geoffrey B. Kehlmann

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd, 12Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Patrick N. Strawbridge

Attorney at Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

10 Post Office Sq, 8Th Flr S Pmb #706

Boston, MA 02109

Linda M. Correia

Attorney at Correia & Puth PLLC

1400 16Th St Nw, Ste 450

Washington, DC 20036

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Caitlin A. Crujido

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

David A. Newman

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Julie G. O'Neill

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Robin A. Smith

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Vanshika Vij

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2100 L St Nw, Ste 900

Washington, DC 20037

Other Attorneys

Saul E. Wolf

Attorney at Manly Stewart & Finaldi

19100 Von Karman Ave, Ste 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Paige Duggins-Clay

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Ave, Ste 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Ellen L. Eardley

Attorney at Mehri & Skalet PLLC

1250 Connecticut Ave Nw, Ste 300

Washington, DC 20036

Rebecca M. Kopplin

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Daniel Tingley

Attorney at Harris Wiltshire & Grannis LLP

1919 M St Nw, 8Th Flr

Washington, DC 20036

Naomi M. Mann

Attorney at Boston University Law School

765 Commonwealth Ave

Boston, MA 02215

Matthew S. Shapanka

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

One Citycenter, 850 10Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-4956

Cari S. Simon

Attorney at The Fierberg National Law Group, PLLC

1701 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Ste 200

Washington, DC 20006

Kristin M. Knuuttila

Attorney at Knuuttila Law, LLC

175 Federal St, Ste 1425

Boston, MA 02110

Aleksandra O. Rushing

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Ste 600

St. Louis, MO 63105-0000

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

1 Courthouse Way, Ste 9200

Boston, MA 02210

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 01/10/2022. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 01/12/2022 05:19 AM]

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Litigants

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketU.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 01/10/2022. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 01/12/2022 05:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketU.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 07/19/2021 and assigned case number 21-84. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE issued. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 04/12/2021 06:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPublic docket note: Miguel Angel Cardona was named United States Secretary of Education as of March 1, 2021. We have substituted him for Phil Rosenfelt, as the appellee. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 04/06/2021 07:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT entered. AFFIRMED. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPINION issued by Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and Joseph N. Laplante,*** U.S. District Judge. Published. ***Of the District of New Hampshire, sitting by designation. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPublic docket note: Phil Rosenfelt was named Acting United States Secretary of Education as of January 20, 2021. Suzanne Goldberg was named Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights as of January 21, 2021. We have substituted them as the appellees. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2).[20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 02/18/2021 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCASE argued. Panel: Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge; Bruce M. Selya, Appellate Judge and Joseph N. Laplante, U.S. District Judge. Arguing attorneys: Alexa R. Baltes for Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. and Michael Qian for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe. [20-1748] (DJT) [Entered: 01/05/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION of attorney presenting oral argument. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Alexa R. Baltes arguing for Appellant Independent Women's Law Center; Arguing Person Information . [20-1748] (DJT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Alexa R. Baltes for Appellants Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc.. [20-1748] (DJT) [Entered: 12/29/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 09/15/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Shiwali G. Patel for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe and Elizabeth Tang for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 09/01/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Alexa R. Baltes for Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc., Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Betsy DeVos and Kenneth L. Marcus, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, Kristin M. Knuuttila for California Women's Law Center, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 09/28/2020 for appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/16/2020. [20-1748] (CTN) [Entered: 08/16/2020 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney have been removed from the service list for this case: Daniel Tingley for Law Professors. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Lauren E. Snyder for Not Party Law Professors. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Daniel Tingley for Not Party Law Professors. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. filed by Attorney Cameron T. Norris. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2020. [20-1748] (CTN) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 08/17/2020 . [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/02/2020 06:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY is a litigant