This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2021 at 05:22:26 (UTC).

Viasat, Inc. v. FCC, et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Viasat, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against FCC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1125

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Viasat, Inc.

Respondents

United States of America

Federal Communications Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

William McGinley Jay

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

David Zimmer

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gerard Justin Cedrone Esquire

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Respondent Attorneys

Jacob M. Lewis

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

Rachel Proctor May

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document #2

Appendix in Support of Viasat's Motion to Stay Pending Judicial Review

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1901361] filed by Robert Nicholson on behalf of Respondent USA. [21-1125] (Nicholson, Robert) [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1901121] to stay underlying order in case filed by Viasat, Inc. in 21-1123, 21-1125 (Service Date: 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,200 Words. [21-1123, 21-1125] (Jay, William) [Entered: 06/02/2021 11:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1900935] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Space Exploration Holdings, LLC [Service Date: 06/02/2021 ] [21-1123, 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128]--[Edited 06/02/2021 by AY] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900573] filed consolidating cases 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128 (Consolidation started 05/28/2021) with 21-1123; directing party to file in 21-1123, 21-1128 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/28/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/28/2021 [21-1123, 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1900532] filed by Rachel Proctor May and co-counsel Jacob M. Lewis on behalf of Respondent FCC in 21-1125, Appellee FCC in 21-1127. [21-1125, 21-1127] (May, Rachel) [Entered: 05/28/2021 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900517] filed consolidating cases 21-1127 (Consolidation started 05/28/2021) with 21-1125 [21-1125, 21-1127] [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900511] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER statement of issues due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER underlying decision due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER procedural motions due 06/28/2021. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 07/12/2021; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 06/28/2021. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 06/28/2021. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 07/12/2021. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 07/12/2021 [21-1125] [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1900505] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1900500-2 ] [21-1125] [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1900500] of a decision by federal agency filed by Viasat, Inc. [Service Date: 05/26/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached. [21-1125] [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [21-1125] [Entered: 05/28/2021 10:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Proctor May

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Matthew Lewis