This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2021 at 05:22:32 (UTC).

Viasat, Inc. v. FCC

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Viasat, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against FCC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1123

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellant

Viasat, Inc.

Appellee

Federal Communications Commission

Intervenor

Space Exploration Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

William McGinley Jay

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

1900 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

David Zimmer

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gerard Justin Cedrone Esquire

Attorney at Goodwin Procter LLP

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Appellee Attorneys

Jacob M. Lewis

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

Rachel Proctor May

Attorney at Federal Communications Commission

45 L Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20554-0004

Intervenor Attorneys

Pratik Arvind Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Ze-wen Julius Chen

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Motion Filed

Open Document #2

Appendix in Support of Viasat's Motion to Stay Pending Judicial Review

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1901361] filed by Robert Nicholson on behalf of Respondent USA. [21-1125] (Nicholson, Robert) [Entered: 06/04/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1901121] to stay underlying order in case filed by Viasat, Inc. in 21-1123, 21-1125 (Service Date: 06/02/2021 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 5,200 Words. [21-1123, 21-1125] (Jay, William) [Entered: 06/02/2021 11:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION [1900935] for leave to intervene [Disclosure Listing: Attached] filed by Space Exploration Holdings, LLC [Service Date: 06/02/2021 ] [21-1123, 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128]--[Edited 06/02/2021 by AY] (Shah, Pratik) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1900573] filed consolidating cases 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128 (Consolidation started 05/28/2021) with 21-1123; directing party to file in 21-1123, 21-1128 initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/28/2021. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/28/2021 [21-1123, 21-1125, 21-1127, 21-1128] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1900571] of Notice of Appeal to appellee [ # 1900568-2 ] [21-1123] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1900568] of a decision by federal agency filed by Viasat, Inc. [Service Date: 05/26/2021 ] Disclosure Statement: Not Attached. [21-1123] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAGENCY NOTICE OF APPEAL CASE docketed. [21-1123] [Entered: 05/28/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ViaSat, Inc. Employee Benefit Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Zimmer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerard Justin Cedrone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William M. Jay Esq.