This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/24/2020 at 06:01:20 (UTC).

Verogna v. Twitter, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Verogna filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Twitter, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1933

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TWITTER INC.

TWITTER, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

SENSA VEROGNA, individual

No Address Provided, MA 99999-9999

Interested Party

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jonathan Eck

Attorney at Orr & Reno PA

45 S Main St, Po Box 3550

Concord, NH 03302-3550

David A. Perez

Attorney at Perkin Coie LLP

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-0000

Julie E. Schwartz

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

3150 Porter Dr

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jonathan Mark Eck

Attorney at Orr & Reno PA

45 S Main St, Po Box 3550

Concord, NH 03302-3550

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sensa Verogna

Attorney at No Address Provided

No Address Provided

No Address Provided, MA 99999-9999

Interested Party Attorneys

Seth R. Aframe

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

53 Pleasant St, 4Th Flr

Concord, NH 03301

Indraneel Sur

Attorney at US Dept. of Justice

Po Box 883, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #5

Form 4

Open Document #4

Notice to Consel and Pro Se

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Twitter, Inc. to motion to consolidate cases [ # 6383076-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 11/23/2020. [20-1933] (JES) [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION and memorandum to consolidate cases filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna. Certificate of service dated 11/12/2020. [20-1933, 20-2005, 20-2006] (GAK) [Entered: 11/19/2020 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 12/03/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Indraneel Sur for US in 20-1933, 20-2005, 20-2006. [20-1933, 20-2005, 20-2006] (GAK) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna to motion to consolidate cases [ # 6374936-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/30/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 11/12/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Indraneel Sur for US. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/29/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Twitter Inc. to motion [ # 6374936-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1933] (JES) [Entered: 10/23/2020 08:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE issued. After 11/05/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jonathan Eck for Twitter Inc.. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/22/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to join or consolidate related appeals filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. In light of the district court's September 28, 2020, order staying further action pending resolution of plaintiff's appeal, plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay Compulsion of True Identity is denied as moot. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/16/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to Suspend Rule or to File True Identity Under Seal filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/09/2020 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Twitter Inc. filed by Attorney Julie E. Schwartz. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1933] (JES) [Entered: 10/09/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketFiling fee was paid in the district court by Appellant Sensa Verogna on 10/06/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee Twitter Inc.. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Twitter Inc. to Emergency MOTION to Stay Complusion of True Identity [ # 6370168-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 09/28/2020 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Twitter Inc. filed by Attorney David A. Perez. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2020. [20-1933] (DAP) [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEmergency MOTION to Stay Complusion of True Identity filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna. Certificate of service dated 09/25/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #57) filed by Appellant Sensa Verogna. Fee due 10/09/2020. [20-1933] (GAK) [Entered: 09/25/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWITTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Indraneel Sur Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth R. Aframe