This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 05:37:57 (UTC).

Vernon Collins v. US

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Vernon Collins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6013

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner / Appellant

VERNON A. COLLINS

Trenton, NJ 08625-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Zachary Byrne Stendig

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201-0000

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Vernon A. Collins

Attorney at NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON

P. O. Box 861

Trenton, NJ 08625-0000

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00954-CCB. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/30/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? N/A. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:53 PM]

3 #1

Fee Notice

#4

(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Vernon A. Collins NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON P. O. Box 861 Trenton, NJ 08625-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:56 PM]

3 #2

IFP Application

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Vernon A. Collins NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON P. O. Box 861 Trenton, NJ 08625-0000. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Vernon A. Collins - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/03/2020. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00954-CCB. Mailed to: Vernon A. Collins NEW JERSEY STATE PRISON P. O. Box 861 Trenton, NJ 08625-0000. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • (#2) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00954-CCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00954-CCB. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/30/2019. Case manager: ABrownlee. Did district court rule on COA? N/A. [20-6013] AB [Entered: 01/02/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.