This case was last updated from PACER on 07/23/2019 at 06:10:07 (UTC).

Venoco, LLC v. Plains Pipeline, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Venoco, LLC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Plains Pipeline, L P . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-55600

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PLAINS AAP, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

PAA GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P., a Texas limited partnership

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

PLAINS GP HOLDINGS, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

Plaintiff / Appellant

VENOCO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, FKA Venoco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Melinda Eades LeMoine

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brad D. Brian Esquire

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Henry Weissmann

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Laura Wirth

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Aaron Daniel Pennekamp

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson, LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Grant Davis-Denny

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Benjamin Levin

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Paul Yetter

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Christian J. Ward

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Reagan W. Simpson

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

April L. Farris

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Case Opening Packet

#2

#4

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The record reflects that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion and that an amended notice of appeal has been filed to include the order denying the post-judgment motion. Accordingly, the notice of appeal is so amended and briefing resumes. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due September 30, 2019; the answering brief is due October 30, 2019; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11362069] (JPD) [Entered: 07/12/2019 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed (ECF) Appellant Venoco, LLC Correspondence: Letter advising Court of Amended Notice of Appeal. Date of service: 07/12/2019 [11361777] [19-55600] (Simpson, Reagan) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 7/12/19. [11361766] (CW) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#8) Terminated Laura Wirth for Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC in 19-55600 (Due to incorrect ECF account information). [11361658] (SLM) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 07/10/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11336822] (VS) [Entered: 06/19/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court.[11317606] (WL) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • (#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/31/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11315470] (AD) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/31/2019. [11314838] [19-55600] (Weissmann, Henry) [Entered: 05/31/2019 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • (#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/29/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11312769] (AD) [Entered: 05/29/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Venoco, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/29/2019. [11312230] [19-55600] (Simpson, Reagan) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/31/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/24/2019. Transcript due 07/22/2019. Appellant Venoco, LLC opening brief due 09/03/2019. Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 10/03/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11309252] (RT) [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAINS GP, LLC, as Successor in Interest to Alpha Crude Connector, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Plains Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Venoco, LLC et al. is a litigant