This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2021 at 14:32:37 (UTC).

Venoco, LLC v. Plains Pipeline, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Venoco, LLC filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Plains Pipeline, L P . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-55193

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

PLAINS AAP, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

PAA GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

PLAINS PIPELINE, L.P., a Texas limited partnership

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN PIPELINE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

PLAINS ALL AMERICAN GP, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

PLAINS GP HOLDINGS, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership

Plaintiff / Appellant

VENOCO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, FKA Venoco, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Grant Davis-Denny

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Benjamin Levin

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Colin A. Devine

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Henry Weissmann

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson, LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

R. Paul Yetter

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Reagan W. Simpson

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

Christian J. Ward

Attorney at Yetter Coleman LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 4100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 16 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC; Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 09/30/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12204241] (GS) [Entered: 08/17/2021 05:19 PM]

#16

(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 09/30/2021. Date of service: 08/17/2021. [12203885] [21-55193] (Devine, Colin) [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:08 PM]

#15

(#15) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): (ECF Filing) filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC; Granting Motion [ # 14 ] (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC. Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 08/31/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12153604] (LKK) [Entered: 06/24/2021 02:19 PM]

#14

(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 08/31/2021. Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153434] [21-55193] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 6/24/2021 by TYL] (Devine, Colin) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:46 PM]

#11

(#11) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 9 ] submitted by Venoco, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 10 ] submitted by Venoco, LLC are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12131878] (SML) [Entered: 06/02/2021 04:24 PM]

10 #8

ER Vol 7

10 #7

ER Vol 6

10 #6

ER Vol 5

10 #5

ER Vol 4

10 #4

ER Vol 3

10 #3

ER Vol 2

10 #2

ER Vol 1

10 #1

ER Vol Index

#9

(#9) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Venoco, LLC. Date of service: 06/02/2021. [12130746] [21-55193] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:27 AM]

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12072822] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2021 02:20 PM]

#5

(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/06/2021, 11:30 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12055236] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2021 03:42 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/22/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12027544] (VS) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:00 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Venoco, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/04/2021. [12024880] [21-55193] (Simpson, Reagan) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:43 PM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 16 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC; Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 09/30/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12204241] (GS) [Entered: 08/17/2021 05:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed (ECF) Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 09/30/2021. Date of service: 08/17/2021. [12203885] [21-55193] (Devine, Colin) [Entered: 08/17/2021 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): (ECF Filing) filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC; Granting Motion [ # 14 ] (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellees Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P., Plains AAP, L.P. and PAA GP, LLC. Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 08/31/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12153604] (LKK) [Entered: 06/24/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed (ECF) Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 08/31/2021. Date of service: 06/24/2021. [12153434] [21-55193] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 6/24/2021 by TYL] (Devine, Colin) [Entered: 06/24/2021 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Received paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 9 ] filed by Venoco, LLC. [12136325] (SD) [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 10 ] in 7 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellant Venoco, LLC. [12136152] (KWG) [Entered: 06/07/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 9 ] submitted by Venoco, LLC is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 10 ] submitted by Venoco, LLC are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12131878] (SML) [Entered: 06/02/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Venoco, LLC. Date of service: 06/02/2021. [12130807] [21-55193] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Venoco, LLC. Date of service: 06/02/2021. [12130746] [21-55193] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 06/02/2021 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Venoco, LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Venoco, LLC opening brief due 06/02/2021. Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 07/02/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12086778] (JN) [Entered: 04/26/2021 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Venoco, LLC. New requested due date is 06/02/2021. [12086735] [21-55193] (Ward, Christian) [Entered: 04/26/2021 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12072822] (VS) [Entered: 04/13/2021 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 04/06/2021, 11:30 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12055236] (VS) [Entered: 03/26/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 03/22/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12027544] (VS) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/04/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12025233]. [21-55193] (AD) [Entered: 03/04/2021 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellant Venoco, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/04/2021. [12024880] [21-55193] (Simpson, Reagan) [Entered: 03/04/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Venoco, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/10/2021. Appellant Venoco, LLC opening brief due 05/03/2021. Appellees PAA GP, LLC, Plains AAP, L.P., Plains All American GP, LLC, Plains All American Pipeline, L.P., Plains GP Holdings, L.P. and Plains Pipeline, L.P. answering brief due 06/02/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12023322] (JBS) [Entered: 03/03/2021 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAINS GP, LLC, as Successor in Interest to Alpha Crude Connector, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Plains Pipeline, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Venoco, LLC et al. is a litigant