This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/13/2021 at 06:08:26 (UTC).

Vazquez-Ramos, et al v. Triple-S Salud, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Vazquez-Ramos filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Triple-S Salud, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1115

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

CARIBBEAN UROCENTRE, CSP

IRMA L. RIVERA-RAMOS

JAVIER E. COLON-IRIZARRY

ADVANCE UROLOGY GROUP, LLC

JUAN M. COLON-RIVERA

ROBERTO VAZQUEZ-RAMOS

LUIS M. MUNIZ-COLON

WEST UROLOGY GROUP PSC

ADVANCED UROLOGY GROUP, LLC

Defendant / Appellees

UROLOGIST, LLC

MSO OF PUERTO RICO, LLC

ABC INSURANCE COMPANY

TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC.

HECTOR M. RODRIGUEZ-BLAZQUEZ

UROLOGICS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jorge Martinez-Luciano

Attorney at Ingenuitas Law Firm

1607 Ponce De Leon Ave, Ste 404

San Juan, PR 00909

Emil J. Rodriguez Escudero

Attorney at M.L. & R.E. Law Firm

Cobian'S Plaza, 1607 Ponce De Leon Ave

San Juan, PR 00909

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carla S. Loubriel

Attorney at Casellas Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta

Attorney at Casellas Alcover & Burgos PSC

Po Box 364924

San Juan, PR 00936-4924

Ramon Enrique Dapena

Attorney at Morell Cartagena & Dapena LLC

Po Box 13399

San Juan, PR 00908

Ivan Llado-Rodriguez

Attorney at Morell Cartagena & Dapena LLC

Po Box 13399

San Juan, PR 00908

Luis R. Roman-Negron

Attorney at Sanabria Bauermeister Garcia & Berio LLC

Po Box 363068

San Juan, PR 00936-3068

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

Open Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Attorney RAMON E. DAPENA. Certificate of service dated 04/07/2021. [21-1115] (RED) [Entered: 04/07/2021 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MSO of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Attorney IVAN J. LLADO RODRIGUEZ. Certificate of service dated 04/07/2021. [21-1115] (IL) [Entered: 04/07/2021 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Urologics, LLC, Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez and Urologist, LLC filed by Attorney Cesar T Alcover. Certificate of service dated 03/09/2021. [21-1115] (CTA) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Hector M. Rodriguez-Blazquez, Urologics, LLC and Urologist, LLC filed by Attorney Carla S. Loubriel-Carrion. Certificate of service dated 03/08/2021. [21-1115] (CSL) [Entered: 03/08/2021 08:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 04/14/2021 for appellant Advanced Urology Group, LLC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, Juan M. Colon-Rivera, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos and West Urology Group PSC. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1115] (JMK) [Entered: 03/05/2021 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Advanced Urology Group, LLC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, Juan M. Colon-Rivera, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos and West Urology Group PSC indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 03/04/2021. [21-1115] (JM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Advanced Urology Group, LLC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, Juan M. Colon-Rivera, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos and West Urology Group PSC. Certificate of service dated 03/04/2021. [21-1115] (JM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Advanced Urology Group, LLC, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, West Urology Group PSC, Juan M. Colon-Rivera and Roberto Vazquez-Ramos filed by Attorney Jorge Martinez-Luciano. Certificate of service dated 03/04/2021. [21-1115] (JM) [Entered: 03/04/2021 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript report/order form due 03/15/2021. [21-1115] (ALW) [Entered: 02/27/2021 12:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triple-S Salud, Inc. filed by Attorney Luis R. Roman-Negron. Certificate of service dated 02/15/2021. [21-1115] (LRR) [Entered: 02/15/2021 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #99) filed by Appellants Advance Urology Group, LLC, Caribbean Urocentre, CSP, Javier E. Colon-Irizarry, Juan M. Colon-Rivera, Luis M. Muniz-Colon, Irma L. Rivera-Ramos, Roberto Vazquez-Ramos and West Urology Group PSC. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/26/2021. [21-1115] (JMK) [Entered: 02/12/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSO of Puerto Rico, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIPLE-S SALUD, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta