This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 06:01:03 (UTC).

Vasquez-Ramos v. Barr

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Vasquez-Ramos filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2786

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jhona Michael Vasquez-Ramos

Batavia, NY 14020

Respondents

Jeffrey Searls, Facility Acting Director Buffalo Federal Detention Center

Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal, Buffalo Field Office, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement

William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jhona Michael Vasquez-Ramos

Attorney at Buffalo Federal Detention Facility

4250 Federal Drive

Batavia, NY 14020

Respondent Attorneys

Tiffany H. Lee

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of New York

138 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

Christina Parascandola Esq.

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER, dated 09/29/2020, stating that Appellants principal brief must be filed on or before December 15, 2020, copy to pro se Appellee, FILED.[2940893] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:34 PM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

9 #2

Supporting Document

8 #4

Supporting Document

8 #3

Supporting Document

8 #2

Supporting Document

8 #1

Form C FILED

6 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER, dated 09/29/2020, stating that Appellants principal brief must be filed on or before December 15, 2020, copy to pro se Appellee, FILED.[2940893] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/29/2020 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffrey Searls, informing Court of proposed due date 12/29/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2020 by US mail.[2940408] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/29/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NEW CASE MANAGER, Patrick Finn, ASSIGNED.[2933633] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by US mail.[2930706] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 09/15/2020 by US mail.[2930704] [20-2786] [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY, Christina Parascandola, [ # 6 ], in place of attorney Tiffany H. Lee, SUBSTITUTED.[2920629] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/31/2020 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. Service date 08/28/2020 by US mail. [2919421] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/28/2020 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2916523] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/25/2020 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2915084] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2915081] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 06/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2915078] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant William P. Barr, Thomas Feeley and Jeffrey Searls, FILED. [2915052] [20-2786] [Entered: 08/24/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferey Searls, Facility Acting Director Buffalo Federal Detention facility is a litigant

Latest cases where Thomas Feeley, Field Office Director for Detention and Removal, Buffalo Field Office, Bureau of Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christina Parascandola

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiffany H. Lee