Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2020 at 05:23:27 (UTC).

Vasquez-Castillo v. Barr

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Vasquez-Castillo filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-9591

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ERIK VASQUEZ-CASTILLO

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brenda M. Villalpando

Attorney at Villalpando Law Firm

9434 Viscount Boulevard, Suite 102

El Paso, TX 79925

Respondent Attorneys

Jessica Danielle Strokus

Attorney at Office of Immigration Litigation

P.O. Box 828, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

Anthony Cardozo Payne

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762252] Entry of appearance filed by Jessica Danielle Strokus for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9591] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10762241] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Anthony Cardozo Payne for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9591] [Entered: 08/12/2020 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket[10762238] Entry of appearance submitted by Jessica Strokus for William Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 08/12/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-9591] JDS [Entered: 08/12/2020 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket[10762236] Entry of appearance submitted by Anthony C. Payne for Respondent Mr. William P. BarrWilliam Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 08/12/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 08/12/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 8/12/20.] [20-9591] ACP [Entered: 08/12/2020 07:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10761953] Petition for review filed. Served on 08/11/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 08/11/2020 letter. Fee pd:, Receipt #: A10-47563-545, Amount: $ 500.00. Docketing statement and notice of appearance due 08/25/2020 for Erik Vasquez-Castillo. Agency record due 09/21/2020 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 08/25/2020 for William P. Barr. [20-9591] [Entered: 08/11/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Danielle Strokus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lansing W. Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OIL OIL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Cardozo Payne