Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 06:48:26 (UTC).

Varone v. Saul

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Varone filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-103

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Robert Varone

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew M. Saul, Commisioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Christopher James Bowes

Attorney at Law Office of Christopher James Bowes

54 Cobblestone Drive

Shoreham, NY 11786

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Varuni Nelson

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Dara Ain Olds Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Robert Varone Brief due date as 04/30/2021 FILED.[3055226] [21-103] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:48 PM]

#20

(#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Sarah Jean-Charles, ASSIGNED.[3052386] [21-103] [Entered: 03/09/2021 04:35 PM]

#15

(#15) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, informing the Court that appellant will proceed on the original record and will not file a joint appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026025] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:06 PM]

#14

(#14) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026020] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:04 PM]

#13

(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026014] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:02 PM]

#12

(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3025994] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:52 PM]

#11

(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3025992] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:51 PM]

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020969] [21-103] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:41 AM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3020893] [21-103] [Entered: 01/26/2021 10:57 AM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[3016382] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:57 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[3016381] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:56 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Robert Varone Brief due date as 04/30/2021 FILED.[3055226] [21-103] [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NEW CASE MANAGER, Sarah Jean-Charles, ASSIGNED.[3052386] [21-103] [Entered: 03/09/2021 04:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, informing the Court that appellant will proceed on the original record and will not file a joint appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026025] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026020] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3026014] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3025994] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3025992] [21-103] [Entered: 01/29/2021 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Dara Ain Olds for Andrew M. Saul, in case 21-103, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3021355] [21-103] [Entered: 01/26/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3020969] [21-103] [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Andrew M. Saul, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3020893] [21-103] [Entered: 01/26/2021 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3016523] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 08:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14000960, FILED.[3016385] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[3016382] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[3016381] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Robert Varone, FILED. [3016376] [21-103] [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dara A Olds

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Varuni Nelson