This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/02/2021 at 06:03:34 (UTC).

Vann v. Paxton

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Vann filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Paxton. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-40355

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Richard Chambers, Wylie Police Department

Ashley Kells, Chief Felony Prosecutor, Collin County, TX

Ken Paxton, Attorney General of the State of Texas

Melenie Wiesman, Felony Prosecutor, Collin County, TX

Melanie Wiesman, Felony Prosecutor, Collin County, TX

Plaintiff / Appellant

Tony Lamar Vann

Dallas, TX 75216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

William Wayne Krueger Esq. III

Attorney at Law Office Of William W. Krueger, III

501 W. Lookout

Richardson, TX 75080

Robert Jacob Davis

Attorney at Matthews, Shiels, Knott, Eden, Davis & Beanland,L.L.P.

8131 Lyndon B. Johnson Freeway

Dallas, TX 75251

Melissa Russo

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Tony Lamar Vann

2717 Custer Drive

Dallas, TX 75216

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to file sufficient appellant's brief and sufficient record excerpts [9609317-2] [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/30/2021 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCOURT ACTION striking Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann [ # 9588723-2 ], striking Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann [ # 9588745-2 ] [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/30/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ORDER to strike appellant brief [9609279-2]; to strike record excerpts [9609279-2]; striking Appellant Brief filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann [ # 9588723-2 ], striking Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann [ # 9588745-2 ] [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/30/2021 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Melenie Wiesman in 21-40355 substituted by Appellee Melanie Wiesman in 21-40355 [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/29/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. (PAPER COPY REQUIREMENTS ARE SUSPENDED AT THIS TIME AND WILL BE REQUESTED WHEN NEEDED) [21-40355] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Ken Paxton. Date of service: 06/29/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davis, Krueger, Russo; US mail - Appellant Vann [21-40355] (Melissa Russo ) [Entered: 06/29/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the application for reimbursement of EAJA fees received from Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann because motions for attorney's fees under EAJA must be filed by counsel [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/22/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTRICKEN RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require record citations for each document in the table of contents; docket sheet must be added as the first document. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 06/17/2021 for Appellant Tony Lamar Vann [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTRICKEN APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Tony Lamar Vann. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires signature on Cert of Int Parties. Additionally the Brief requires double-spacing, standard of review, citations to the record. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 06/17/2021 for Appellant Tony Lamar Vann.. Appellee's Brief due on 07/06/2021 for Appellees Richard Chambers, Ashley Kells, Ken Paxton and Melenie Wiesman [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to proceed IFP received from Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann because document is unecessary as appellant is already proceeding IFP [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Melissa Russo for Appellee Ken Paxton in 21-40355 [21-40355] (JMW) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Melissa Russo for Mr. Ken Paxton for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40355] (Melissa Russo ) [Entered: 05/12/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee Ashley Kells in 21-40355, Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee Melenie Wiesman in 21-40355 [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 05/12/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Wayne Krueger III for Appellee Richard Chambers in 21-40355 [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 05/12/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40355] (William Wayne Krueger III) [Entered: 05/11/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Jacob Davis for Ms. Ashley Kells and Ms. Melenie Wiesman for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-40355] (Robert Jacob Davis ) [Entered: 05/11/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/21/2021 for Appellant Tony Lamar Vann. [21-40355] (CMB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-40355] (CMB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-570. Electronic ROA due on 05/24/2021. [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9569349-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-40355] (RLL) [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Lamar Vann [21-40355] (ABT) [Entered: 05/03/2021 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less