This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/28/2022 at 08:39:42 (UTC).

Vanasa Chatteram v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/27/2022 Vanasa Chatteram filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Omni Hotels Management Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-10302

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VANASA CHATTERAM, an individual

Defendant / Appellee

OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, a foreign corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Annabel C. Majewski

Attorney at Wasson & Associates, Chartered

28 W Flagler St Ste 600

Miami, FL 33130

Thomas Charles Allison

Attorney at Byrd Campbell, PA

180 N Park Ave N Ste 2A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Tucker Harrison Byrd

Attorney at Byrd Campbell, PA

180 N Park Ave N Ste 2A

Winter Park, FL 32789

Johnny A. Pineyro

Attorney at Florida Injury Law Firm

860 Commodity Cir

Orlando, FL 32819

Andre Raikhelson

Attorney at Law Offices of Andre G. Raikhelson

301 Yamato Rd Ste 1240

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Roy D. Wasson

Attorney at Wasson & Associates, Chartered

28 W Flagler St Ste 600

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

A.J. Hernandez

Attorney at Milton Leach Whitman D'Andrea & Eslinger, PA

3127 Atlantic Blvd Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Michael P. Milton

Attorney at Milton Leach Whitman D'Andrea & Eslinger, PA

3127 Atlantic Blvd Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #3

DC Order doc 41

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Annabel C. Majewski for Chatteram [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/01/2022 04:03 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:46 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. No hearings. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:17 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:05 PM]

Open Document

Notice of Pendency of Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 Motion filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:10 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael P. Milton for Appellee Omni Hotels Management Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10302] (ECF: Michael Milton) [Entered: 02/23/2022 01:13 PM]

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

Response to Jurisdictional Question with Motion

Open Document #2

Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Correct Deficient Allegations of Citi

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Omni Hotels Management Corporation [22-10302] (ECF: Michael Milton) [Entered: 03/11/2022 11:57 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee Omni Hotels Management Corporation [22-10302] (ECF: Michael Milton) [Entered: 03/11/2022 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion Amend the Complaint filed by Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 03/07/2022 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Vanasa Chatteram. [Entered: 02/25/2022 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Michael P. Milton for Appellee Omni Hotels Management Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10302] (ECF: Michael Milton) [Entered: 02/23/2022 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 02/17/2022 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 Motion filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. No hearings. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Annabel C. Majewski for Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/03/2022 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Annabel C. Majewski for Chatteram [22-10302] (ECF: Annabel Majewski) [Entered: 02/01/2022 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Vanasa Chatteram on 01/26/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 03/08/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/10/2022 as to Appellant Vanasa Chatteram. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 02/24/2022 as to Appellee Omni Hotels Management Corporation [Entered: 01/31/2022 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OMNI HOTELS MANAGEMENT CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Payne Milton(Designation Retained)