This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/20/2022 at 15:01:23 (UTC).

Valley Surgical Center, LLC, et al v. County of Los Angeles, et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Valley Surgical Center, LLC, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Los Angeles,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-55744

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Intervenor Plaintiff

INDEPENDENT MEDICAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant / Appellees

JOHN KADES, is being sued in his individual capacity

RAFFI DJABOURIAN, M.D., is being sued in his individual capacity

DENIS C. ASTARITA, M.D., is being sued in his individual capacity

SELMA CALMES, M.D., is being sued in her individual capacity

ADRIAN MARINOVICH, M.D., is being sued in his individual capacity

LAKSHMANAN SATHYAVAGISWARAN, M.D., is being sued in his individual capacity

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a government entity

DOES, 1-10, inclusive

ED WINTER, is being sued in his individual capacity

Intervenor Defendant / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff / Appellant

VALLEY SURGICAL CENTER, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Gysler

Attorney at MONROY, AVERBUCK AND GYSLER

32123 Lindero Canyon Road

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Timothy T, Coates

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3626

Alana Rotter

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3626

Harold G. Becks Esquire

Attorney at Harold G. Becks & Associates

3250 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William B. Welden Esquire

Attorney at Welden Law Office

9663 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 234

Santa Monica, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

#2

#3

4 #1

Main Document

4 #2

Additional Document

#6

#7

#12

(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Valley Surgical Center, LLC Correspondence: Notice of ruling in case below on Rule 60 b Motion and of 9th Circuit's July 30, 2020 Order re stay of appeal pending ruling on Rule 60 b Motion. Date of service: 10/06/2021 [12248722] [20-55744] (Welden, William) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:27 AM]

#13

(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record and appellants response to this courts July 28, 2020 order reflects that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion. Accordingly, the stay of proceedings is lifted, and briefing may proceed. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due November 29, 2021. The answering brief is due December 29, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12259741] (OC) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:17 AM]

#14

(#14) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: RY) Dismissing case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1) Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to file opening brief. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [12332210] (RY) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:11 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: RY) Dismissing case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1) Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to file opening brief. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [12332210] (RY) [Entered: 01/05/2022 02:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): A review of the record and appellants response to this courts July 28, 2020 order reflects that the district court has denied the post-judgment motion. Accordingly, the stay of proceedings is lifted, and briefing may proceed. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due November 29, 2021. The answering brief is due December 29, 2021. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12259741] (OC) [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed (ECF) Appellant Valley Surgical Center, LLC Correspondence: Notice of ruling in case below on Rule 60 b Motion and of 9th Circuit's July 30, 2020 Order re stay of appeal pending ruling on Rule 60 b Motion. Date of service: 10/06/2021 [12248722] [20-55744] (Welden, William) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#11) Added Attorney(s) Timothy T, Coates for party(s) Appellee Raffi Djabourian Appellee County of Los Angeles Appellee Lakshmanan Sathyavagiswaran Appellee Selma Calmes Appellee John Kades Appellee Denis C. Astarita Appellee Adrian Marinovich Appellee Ed Winter, in case 20-55744. [11867252] (JFF) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#10) Added Attorney(s) Alana Rotter for party(s) Appellee Raffi Djabourian Appellee County of Los Angeles Appellee Lakshmanan Sathyavagiswaran Appellee Selma Calmes Appellee John Kades Appellee Denis C. Astarita Appellee Adrian Marinovich Appellee Ed Winter, in case 20-55744. [11867248] (JFF) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Timothy T. Coates (Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP, 5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90036) for Appellees Denis C. Astarita, M.D., Selma Calmes, M.D., County of Los Angeles, Raffi Djabourian, M.D., John Kades, Adrian Marinovich, M.D., Lakshmanan Sathyavagiswaran and Ed Winter. Date of service: 10/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11867197] [20-55744] (Coates, Timothy) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alana H. Rotter (Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP, 5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90036) for Appellees Denis C. Astarita, M.D., Selma Calmes, M.D., County of Los Angeles, Raffi Djabourian, M.D., John Kades, Adrian Marinovich, M.D., Lakshmanan Sathyavagiswaran and Ed Winter. Date of service: 10/21/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11867183] [20-55744] (Rotter, Alana) [Entered: 10/21/2020 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including requests for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerks office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions. [11820202] (OC) [Entered: 09/11/2020 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/10/2020, 2:00 p.m., PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [11794758] (VS) [Entered: 08/19/2020 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/13/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11788792]. [20-55744] (AD) [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Valley Surgical Center, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/13/2020. [11788506] [20-55744] (Welden, William) [Entered: 08/13/2020 03:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11787831] (LW) [Entered: 08/13/2020 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LC) The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4). The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, appellate proceedings other than mediation shall be held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 7 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall notify this court in writing of the ruling and shall advise whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11768909] (TSP) [Entered: 07/28/2020 10:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Valley Surgical Center, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/30/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/24/2020. Transcript due 09/22/2020. Appellant Valley Surgical Center, LLC opening brief due 10/29/2020. Appellees Denis C. Astarita, Selma Calmes, County of Los Angeles, Raffi Djabourian, Does, John Kades, Adrian Marinovich, Lakshmanan Sathyavagiswaran and Ed Winter answering brief due 11/30/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11763030] (RT) [Entered: 07/23/2020 08:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Independent Medical Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALLEY SURGICAL CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William B. Welden Esquire