This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 06:01:01 (UTC).

Valles Rubio v. Veintimilla Castro

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 Valles Rubio filed an Other lawsuit against Veintimilla Castro. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3740

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Segundo Melchor Valles Rubio

Respondent

Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert H. Pees Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

1 Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Saurabh Sharad Esq.

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

1 Bryant Park

New York, NY 10036

Respondent Attorneys

Yoav Michael Griver

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Bryan Dean Leinbach Esq.

Attorney at Zeichner Ellman & Krause LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2703929] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:17 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2704295] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:49 PM]

#8

(#8) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, informing the Court that pursuant to Local Rule 4.3, this case includes a claim under the 1980 Hague Convention of the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction Act. The parties are jointly requesting an expedited briefing schedule, RECEIVED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2704298] [19-3740]--[Edited 11/13/2019 by VB] [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:57 PM]

#9

(#9) MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2704300] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:05 PM]

#13

(#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709423] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:31 PM]

#45

(#45) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 825-1099), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742241] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:59 PM]

#44

(#44) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 551-824), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742240] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:56 PM]

43 #2

Supporting Document

43 #1

Appendix FILED

42 #3

Supporting Document

42 #2

Supporting Document

42 #1

Appendix FILED

#41

(#41) SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742235] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:43 PM]

#40

(#40) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742232] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:40 PM]

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 4 of 4, (pp. 825-1099), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742241] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 3 of 4, (pp. 551-824), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742240] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 4, (pp. 275-550), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742239] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 4, (pp. 1-274), on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742238] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742235] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 01/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2742232] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 07:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time Appellants opening brief is due 01/02/2020, Appellees answering brief is due 02/10/2020, and Appellants reply brief is due 02/25/2020 [ # 35 ] filed by Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, by RKW, FILED. [2741898][39] [19-3740] [Entered: 01/02/2020 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2737389] [19-3740] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 01/06/2020, Start Time: 10:00 AM, Required Attendees: Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2718682] [19-3740] [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ATTORNEY, Saurabh Sharad for Segundo Melchor Valles Rubio, in case 19-3740 , [ # 31 ], ADDED.[2713619] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/22/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/19/2019 by CM/ECF. [2710156] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/19/2019 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709427] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2709423] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/18/2019 06:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2704300] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, informing the Court that pursuant to Local Rule 4.3, this case includes a claim under the 1980 Hague Convention of the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction Act. The parties are jointly requesting an expedited briefing schedule, RECEIVED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2704298] [19-3740]--[Edited 11/13/2019 by VB] [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. Service date 11/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2704295] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2703932] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, district court receipt # ANYEDC-12033817, FILED.[2703930] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/15/2019, RECEIVED.[2703929] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Olga Katerine Veintimilla Castro, FILED. [2703920] [19-3740] [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.