This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/26/2020 at 06:01:14 (UTC).

Vale Vista Associates LP v. Cincinnati Casualty Co

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 Vale Vista Associates LP filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Cincinnati Casualty Co. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1688

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

VALE VISTA ASSOCIATES LP

Defendant / Appellee

CINCINNATI CASUALTY CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

John R. O'Keefe Esq. Jr.

Justin T. Barron Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Adam M. Barnes Esq.

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Mediation Instructions

14 #1

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

#13

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

JUDGMENT ORDER

1 #4

OPINION and ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

#1

Case Opening Letter

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY) [Entered: 04/13/2020 03:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP. [20-1688] (JTB) [Entered: 04/10/2020 11:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#12) Attorney Bar status modified for Justin T. Barron, Esq. for Vale Vista Associates LP. Status is now active. (TMK) [Entered: 04/10/2020 10:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Cincinnati Casualty Co. [20-1688] (AMB) [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Adam M. Barnes, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) The Cincinnati Casualty Company. [20-1688] (AMB) [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY STATUS for APPEARANCE FORM filed by Attorney Justin T. Barron, Esq. for Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP. Counsel's current status in this Court's attorney rolls is inactive. An attorney must have active status in order to appear before this Court. R.A.D.E. 17.3. If you wish to return to active status or if you believe that you have been marked inactive in error, please complete the Attorney Admission Renewal/Adjustment of Status Form available on this Court's website by 04/15/2020. Future filings will not be accepted from an attorney in inactive status. (TMK) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John R. O'Keefe, Jr. on behalf of Appellant(s) Vale Vista Associates, L.P.. [20-1688] (JRO) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP. [20-1688] (JTB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP. [20-1688] (JTB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Justin T. Barron on behalf of Appellant(s) Appellant Vale Vista Associates, L.P.. [20-1688] (JTB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [20-1688] (JTB) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Appendix Citation Notice sent to Justin T. Barron, Esq., John R. O'Keefe, Jr., Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 04/10/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Vale Vista Associates LP in District Court No. 2-18-cv-01064. (LMR) [Entered: 03/27/2020 02:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less