This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2019 at 06:01:37 (UTC).

Valdez v. Motyka, et al

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Valdez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Motyka,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1194

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CITY OF DENVER, a municipality

ROBERT MOTYKA, JR., Denver Police Officer, in his individual capacity

Plaintiff / Appellant

MICHAEL VALDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jennifer Johnson

Attorney at Office of the Denver City Attorney

201 West Colfax Avenue, Department 1108

Denver, CO 80202

Wendy Jean Shea

Attorney at Office of the Denver City Attorney

201 West Colfax Avenue, Department 1108

Denver, CO 80202

David Cooperstein

Attorney at Office of the Denver City Attorney

201 West Colfax Avenue, Department 1108

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Jeffrey Pagliuca

Attorney at Haddon, Morgan, and Foreman

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

Jamie Hubbard

Attorney at Haddon, Morgan, and Foreman

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

David George Maxted

Attorney at Haddon, Morgan, and Foreman

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

Laura A. Menninger

Attorney at Haddon, Morgan, and Foreman

150 East 10Th Avenue

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Prelim ROA

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10666202] Appellant/Petitioner's reply brief filed by City of Denver and Robert Motyka, Jr. in 19-1182. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1182, 19-1194] WJS [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docket[10662952] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. Pursuant to the court's 05/31/2019 the Appellants/Cross-Appellees may file a supplemental reply brief. Appellants/Cross-Appellees' optional reply brief due 07/26/2019 for City of Denver and Robert Motyka Jr. Served on 07/15/2019. Text only entry - no attachment. [19-1182, 19-1194] [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Docket[10657562] Minute order filed - Pursuant to the court's 05/31/2019 order Appellee/Cross-Appellant's response memorandum brief is due 07/12/2019 for Michael Valdez. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1182, 19-1194] [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docket[10655800] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 06/13/2019. [19-1194] [Entered: 06/14/2019 06:56 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655709] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David Cooperstein, Ms. Jennifer Johnson and Wendy Jean Shea for City of Denver and Robert Motyka, Jr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1194] [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docket[10655704] Entry of appearance submitted by Mr. David C. Cooperstein, Ms. Jennifer Johnson, and Ms. Wendy Jean Shea for Appellees City of Denver and Robert Motyka, Jr. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 06/13/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1194] DC [Entered: 06/13/2019 02:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docket[10655653] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 06/20/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1194] [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655641] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. David George Maxted, Ms. Laura A Menninger and Mr. Jeffrey Pagliuca for Mr. Michael Valdez. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail, email. [19-1194] [Entered: 06/13/2019 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655631] Notice that a transcript was ordered previously in 19-1192 filed by Mr. Michael Valdez. Served on: 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1194]--[Edited 06/13/2019 by LG to correct event code] DGM [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10655630] Docketing statement filed by Mr. Michael Valdez. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-1194] DGM [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:48 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Docket[10655627] Entry of appearance submitted by Laura A. Menninger; Jeffrey S. Pagliuca; David G. Maxted for Appellant Mr. Michael Valdez for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 06/13/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. --[Edited 06/13/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1194] DGM [Entered: 06/13/2019 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10652735] Order filed by Clerk of the Court to show cause. This matter comes on for consideration sua sponte following a review of the docketing statement filed in appeal no. 19-1182 and the district court docket. Upon consideration thereof, briefing on the merits is TOLLED in both appeals pending further order of this court as the court had identified jurisdictional issues. All other deadlines remain in place. On or before 06/21/2019 the Defendants-Appellants/Cross-Appellees City of Denver and Robert Motyka Jr. shall file a memorandum brief on or before 06/21/2019. Plaintiff-Appellee/Cross-Appellant Valdez shall file a response memorandum brief within 21 days of service of the Defendants' memorandum brief. See attached order. Served on 05/31/2019. [19-1182, 19-1194] [Entered: 05/31/2019 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10652190] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/30/2019 Docketing statement due 06/13/2019 for Michael Valdez. Transcript order form due 06/13/2019 for Michael Valdez. Notice of appearance due on 06/13/2019 for City of Denver, Robert Motyka Jr. and Michael Valdez. [19-1194] [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura A. Menninger(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David George Maxted

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jamie Hughes Hubbard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey S. Pagliuca