Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

Vahan Kelerchian v. Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Fire, et al

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Vahan Kelerchian filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Bureau of Alcohol Tobacco Fire. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3065

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ATTORNEY GENERAL UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO FIREARMS & EXPLOSIVES, AN AGENCY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

REGINA LOMBARDO, ACTING DIRECTOR BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES

Plaintiff / Appellant

VAHAN KELERCHIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Lauren E. DeBruicker Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Joshua Prince Esq.

Attorney at Prince Law Offices

646 Lenape Road

Bechtelsville, PA 19505

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian for Extension of Time to file Brief and appendix until/for Though January 14, 2021 or 45 days. Certificate of Service dated 11/02/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:08 PM]

9 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

9 #1

Briefing Notice Issued

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren DeBruicker, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) Bureau of Alcohol,Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives; Regina Lombardo; William Barr; United States of America. [20-3065] (LED) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:27 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:46 AM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua Prince, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:44 AM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:42 AM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:42 AM]

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:41 AM]

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order

1 #4

caption

1 #3

DC Memorandum 7/17/20

1 #2

DC Order 7/17/20

#1

Civil Case Docketed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting motion filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian for extension of time to file brief and appendix until January 14, 2021. Counsel is advised to review the Court's Notice of October 15, 2012 advising that extensions of time are disfavored.. (ARR) [Entered: 11/04/2020 07:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian for Extension of Time to file Brief and appendix until/for Though January 14, 2021 or 45 days. Certificate of Service dated 11/02/2020. Service made by ECF. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Vahan Kelerchian due on or before 11/30/2020. Appendix due on or before 11/30/2020. (TMM) [Entered: 10/20/2020 11:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren DeBruicker, AUSA on behalf of Appellee(s) Bureau of Alcohol,Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives; Regina Lombardo; William Barr; United States of America. [20-3065] (LED) [Entered: 10/19/2020 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Joshua Prince, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian advising this court that no transcripts are available. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian. [20-3065] (JP) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Vahan Kelerchian in District Court No. 2-20-cv-00253. (TMM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Prince