Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2019 at 06:09:39 (UTC).

USSEC v. Dean Properties, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 USSEC filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dean Properties, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-17045

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

LISA M. KAPLAN

SYNCHRONIZED ORGANIZATIONAL SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL LTD.

THE WATER-WALKING FOUNDATION, INC.

MANNA INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES, INC.

DAVID B. KAPLAN

MANNA INVESTMENTS LLC

SYNCHRONIZED ORGANIZATIONAL SOLUTIONS LLC

Respondent

DEAN PROPERTIES, LLC

Intervenor

MATTHEW B. KAPLAN

Plaintiff / Appellee

U.S. SECURITIES & EXCHANGE COMMISSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Kurt R. Bonds Esquire

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Matthew Pruitt Esquire

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

John Boles Capehart

Attorney at Securities & Exchange Commission

100 F Street, Ne

Washington, DC 20549-9612

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11531178] (BLS) [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:17 AM]

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/22/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11496769] (BLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:48 PM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dean Properties, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/31/2019. [11485423] [19-17045] (Pruitt, Matthew) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:28 PM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11483983] (MS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:19 PM]

1 #6

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #5

Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Mediation Questionnaire Instructions

1 #3

Mediation Questionnaire

1 #2

Mediation Letter

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11531178] (BLS) [Entered: 12/13/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 11/22/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11496769] (BLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#8) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/31/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11485527]. [19-17045] (AD) [Entered: 10/31/2019 06:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Dean Properties, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/31/2019. [11485423] [19-17045] (Pruitt, Matthew) [Entered: 10/31/2019 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#6) Added Attorney(s) Matthew Pruitt for party(s) Appellant Dean Properties, LLC, in case 19-17045. [11485343] (JFF) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • (#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew M. Pruitt (6605 Grand Montecito Parkway Suite 200 Las Vegas, NV 89149) for Appellant Dean Properties, LLC. Date of service: 10/31/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11485310] [19-17045] (Pruitt, Matthew) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11483983] (MS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • (#3) Attorney Shuman Sohrn in 19-17045 substituted by Attorney John Boles Capehart in 19-17045 [11468387] (CW) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • (#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Boles Capehart (U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission, 100 F Street, NE, Washington, DC 20549-9040) for Appellee USSEC. Substitution for Attorney Shuman Sohrn for Appellee USSEC. Date of service: 10/17/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11467332] [19-17045] (Capehart, John) [Entered: 10/17/2019 07:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/18/2019. Transcript due 12/16/2019. Appellant Dean Properties, LLC opening brief due 01/27/2020. Appellee U.S. Securities & Exchange Commission answering brief due 02/27/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11466872] (RT) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MANNA INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEAN PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MANNA INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant