This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2021 at 05:21:22 (UTC).

USA v. Victor Estrada, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Victor Estrada, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10732

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

VICTOR MANUEL ESTRADA, JR.

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Arthur J. Madden III

Attorney at Madden & Soto

465 Dauphin St

Mobile, AL 36602-2403

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Alabama

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S Royal St Ste 600

Mobile, AL 36602

George A. Martin Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

63 S Royal St Ste 600

Mobile, AL 36602

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Martin for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Alabama for USA. [21-10732] (ECF: George Martin) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:44 AM]

Open Document

CJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Arthur J. Madden, III for Appellant Victor Manuel Estrada, Jr.. [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:05 PM]

Open Document #3

DC J&C Appealed DE# 236

Open Document #2

Criminal Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by George Martin for USA U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Alabama for USA. [21-10732] (ECF: George Martin) [Entered: 03/11/2021 10:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCJA appointment issued by this court to Attorney Arthur J. Madden, III for Appellant Victor Manuel Estrada, Jr.. [Entered: 03/10/2021 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Victor Manuel Estrada, Jr. on 02/26/2021. Fee Status: IFP Granted. [Entered: 03/10/2021 05:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer George A. Martin Jr.