This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/13/2021 at 05:20:17 (UTC).

USA v. Spurgeon Green, Jr.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Spurgeon Green, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-10706

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

SPURGEON GREEN, JR.

Coleman, FL 33521-1031

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Spurgeon Green Jr.

Attorney at FCI Coleman Low - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 1031

Coleman, FL 33521-1031

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Huiju Jeon

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 1702

Macon, GA 31202

U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Georgia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 1702

Macon, GA 31202

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Spurgeon Green, Jr.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/20/2021. [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:35 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 03/11/2021 as to Appellant Spurgeon Green, Jr.. [Entered: 03/11/2021 02:16 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Huiju Jeon for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10706] (ECF: Huiju Jeon) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:17 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Georgia for USA. [21-10706] (ECF: Huiju Jeon) [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:32 PM]

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

usdc order 528

Open Document #1

Criminal Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBriefing Notice issued to Appellant Spurgeon Green, Jr.. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/20/2021. [Entered: 03/11/2021 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellate fee was paid on 03/11/2021 as to Appellant Spurgeon Green, Jr.. [Entered: 03/11/2021 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Huiju Jeon for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-10706] (ECF: Huiju Jeon) [Entered: 03/10/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by U.S. Attorney Service - Middle District of Georgia for USA. [21-10706] (ECF: Huiju Jeon) [Entered: 03/05/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Spurgeon Green, Jr. on 03/01/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. [Entered: 03/05/2021 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Huiju Jeon