This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/17/2020 at 06:04:36 (UTC).

USA v. Sharon Santoso

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 USA filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Sharon Santoso. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1673

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

SHARON SANTOSO, a/k/a Isarina Ali, a/k/a Lee Le Ling

Plaintiff / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Zachary Bluestone

4405 East West Highway

Bethesda, MD 20814-0000

Andrew S. Feldman

Attorney at FELDMAN FIRM PLLC

200 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Andrew Simmons Feldman

Attorney at FELDMAN FIRM PLLC

200 South Biscayne Boulevard

Miami, FL 33131

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Richard Jeremy Hagerman

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 227, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Beatriz T. Saiz

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 227, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Robert Joel Branman

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P. O. Box 502

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-03030-PWG. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed dismissing appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [13]; admistratively terminating Motion to dismiss appeal [ # 12 ]. Copies to all parties. [1000775460] [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by US to dismiss appeal [12]. Date and method of service: 07/15/2020 ecf. [1000775453] [20-1673] Robert Branman [Entered: 07/15/2020 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sharon Santoso. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000773970] [20-1673] Andrew Feldman [Entered: 07/13/2020 09:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Returned mail received from Sharon Santoso re [ # 2 ] docketing Notice. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? No action taken. Another US Attorney is perfecting the appeal [1000773146] [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/13/2020 07:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Sharon Santoso re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Sharon Santoso on 07/13/2020. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices is required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/18/2020. Response Brief due 09/17/2020. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKETING STATEMENT by US. [20-1673] Robert Branman [Entered: 07/09/2020 12:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Sharon Santoso re: filing of disclosure form. Disclosure statement due from Sharon Santoso on 07/13/2020. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/08/2020 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to US re: filing of docketing statement Docketing statement due from United States of America on 07/13/2020. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 07/08/2020 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Andrew Feldman for Sharon Santoso. [1000765440] [20-1673] Andrew Feldman [Entered: 06/29/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Robert Branman for US. [1000761543] [20-1673] Robert Branman [Entered: 06/22/2020 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 8:17-cv-03030-PWG. Mailed to: Michael Bluestone, Andrew Feldman, Richard Hagerman dna Beatriz Saiz. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:17-cv-03030-PWG. Case manager: REdwards. [20-1673] RE [Entered: 06/18/2020 09:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEATRIZ T. SAIZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Jeremy Hagerman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Branman