This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:45 (UTC).

USA v. Sergio Quezada-Lopez

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Sergio Quezada-Lopez. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-35589

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

SERGIO QUEZADA-LOPEZ, AKA Cheche, AKA Sergio Quezada-Lopez

Oakdale, LA 71463

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Sergio Quezada-Lopez

Attorney at FCI - FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION - OAKDALE II

P.O. Box 5010

Oakdale, LA 71463

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kemp L. Strickland

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Kelly A. Zusman

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

Kathleen Louise Bickers Esquire I

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Suite 600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Filed Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11386320] (NAC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:25 AM]

#5

(#5) Streamlined request by Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. There are pending motions that affect the briefing schedule and the briefing schedule will be reset upon resolution of the motions. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11415627] (JN) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:47 PM]

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Pro-Se Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

#1

Docketing Letter

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Streamlined request by Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. There are pending motions that affect the briefing schedule and the briefing schedule will be reset upon resolution of the motions. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11415627] (JN) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Filed Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11386320] (NAC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filed Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez motion to appoint counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11386316] (NAC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 07:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • (#2) Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-35589: IFP] ). [11365485] (JW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Sergio Quezada-Lopez opening brief due 09/10/2019. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 10/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11364819] (OC) [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.