This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 16:08:49 (UTC).

USA v. Samuel Mullet, Sr.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2013 USA filed an Other lawsuit against Samuel Mullet, Sr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-3205

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

SAMUEL MULLET, SR.

Amicus Curiae

THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS

AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE

CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS

NAACP

ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE

POLICE EXECUTIVE RESEARCH FORUM

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES

HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION

NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY

SIKH AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN

HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN

NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN

SIKH COALITION

HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST

NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK

SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas E. Chandler

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Bridget Meehan Brennan

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

801 W. Superior Avenue, Suite 400

Cleveland, OH 44113

Steven M. Dettelbach

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Dennis J. Dimsey

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Thomas E. Getz

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

801 W. Superior Avenue, Suite 400

Cleveland, OH 44113

Kristy L. Parker

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

601 D Street, Nw, Suite 5528

Washington, DC 20005-0000

Jessica Dunsay Silver

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Edward G. Bryan

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

1660 W. Second Street, Suite 750

Cleveland, OH 44113

Vanessa Faye Malone

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

1660 W. Second Street, Suite 750

Cleveland, OH 44113

Wendi L. Overmyer

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

50 S. Main Street, Suite 700

Akron, OH 44308

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

David M. Raim

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Lisa M. Bornstein

Attorney at The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights

1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

Joy L. Langford

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Kate McSweeny

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Steven M. Freeman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Michael Lieberman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Seth Marnin

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Miriam Zeidman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

120 S. Lasalle, Suite 1150

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

142 #2

Judge Order

142 #1

Cover Letter

#141

(#141) REPLY filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr. regarding the Government's Opposition to his Motion for Emergency Bond/Furlough . Certificate of Service: 11/13/2014. (WLO) [Entered: 11/13/2014 12:06 PM]

#140

(#140) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for release pending appeal, [ # 139 ]; previously filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer in 13-3205. Response from Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for Appellee USA Certificate of Service:11/13/2014. (TEC) [Entered: 11/13/2014 11:20 AM]

#139

(#139) MOTION filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr. for release pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2014. (WLO) [Entered: 11/12/2014 03:00 PM]

#14

(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 03/04/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. Bruce Matthews. [14] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:38 AM]

#13

(#13) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 03/04/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. George Staiduhar. [13] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:37 AM]

#12

(#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 02/22/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Caroline Mahnke. [12] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:36 AM]

#11

(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr. by Wendi Overmyer. Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (WLO) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:20 AM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr. by Edward G. Bryan. Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:13 AM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Bridget M. Brennan. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2013. (BMB) [Entered: 02/26/2013 10:37 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jessica Dunsay Silver. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (JDS) [Entered: 02/25/2013 04:06 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Thomas E. Chandler. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (TEC) [Entered: 02/25/2013 03:18 PM]

#1

(#1) Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Transcript needed: y. (CLB) [Entered: 02/22/2013 10:20 AM]

#109

RESTRICTED

#107

106 #2

Cover Letter

106 #1

judge order filed

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. George Charles Pappas for Emma Miller. Certificate of Service:06/03/2015. Argument Request: requested. [13-3182, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (FILED ON INCORRECT CASE)--[Edited 06/03/2015 by CB] (GCP) [Entered: 06/03/2015 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CLB) [Entered: 12/01/2014 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 134 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. Jeffrey S. Sutton and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judges; and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., District Judge. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 11/20/2014 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) ORDER filed denying motion for Emergency Bond/Furlough [ # 139 ] filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge; Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., U.S. District Judge. (CLB) [Entered: 11/13/2014 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) REPLY filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr. regarding the Government's Opposition to his Motion for Emergency Bond/Furlough . Certificate of Service: 11/13/2014. (WLO) [Entered: 11/13/2014 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a motion for release pending appeal, [ # 139 ]; previously filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer in 13-3205. Response from Attorney Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for Appellee USA Certificate of Service:11/13/2014. (TEC) [Entered: 11/13/2014 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) MOTION filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr. for release pending appeal. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2014. (WLO) [Entered: 11/12/2014 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) FILED: Motion for Emergency Bond/Furlough by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Certificate of Service: 11/12/2014. ****COUNSEL to refile*****--[Edited 11/12/2014 by PJE] (WLO) [Entered: 11/12/2014 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 134 ]; previously filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response from Attorney Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Appellant Eli M. Miller Certificate of Service:10/29/2014. [13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (JSG) [Entered: 10/29/2014 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) RESPONSE to petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 134 ], previously filed by filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Certificate of service: 10/29/2014. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (WLO) [Entered: 10/29/2014 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 03/04/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. Bruce Matthews. [14] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 03/04/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. George Staiduhar. [13] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Edward G. Bryan for Samuel Mullet, Sr.; transcript ordered on 02/22/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Caroline Mahnke. [12] Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr. by Wendi Overmyer. Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (WLO) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr. by Edward G. Bryan. Certificate of Service: 03/04/2013. (EGB) [Entered: 03/04/2013 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Bridget M. Brennan. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2013. (BMB) [Entered: 02/26/2013 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jessica Dunsay Silver. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (JDS) [Entered: 02/25/2013 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Thomas E. Chandler. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (TEC) [Entered: 02/25/2013 03:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CLB) [Entered: 02/22/2013 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Transcript needed: y. (CLB) [Entered: 02/22/2013 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM is a litigant