This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/16/2022 at 05:10:30 (UTC).

USA v. Sam Solakyan

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Sam Solakyan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50023

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

SAM SARKIS SOLAKYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Faraz R. Mohammadi

Adam Paul Schleifer Esquire

Daniel Earl Zipp

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Marcus S. Bourassa

Benjamin Lee Coleman

Timothy Allen Scott

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorney Appeals Packet

 

Docket Entries

02/14/2022

Docket(#2) COURT CORRECTION: Added Attorney(s) Daniel Earl Zipp for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 22-50023. [12368958] (SLM) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:24 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: 60 Months. Transcript ordered by 03/07/2022. Transcript due 04/04/2022. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 05/16/2022 for Sam Sarkis Solakyan. Appellee brief due 06/13/2022 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12368918] (ABT) [Entered: 02/14/2022 09:12 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less