This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:22 (UTC).

USA v. Salahudin Shaheed

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Salahudin Shaheed. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2632

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

SALAHUDIN SHAHEED

Berlin, NH 03570

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Salahudin Shaheed

Attorney at Berlin FCI

P.O. Box 9000

Berlin, NH 03570

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jeanine Linehan Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Maureen McCartney Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for Permissiom to File Over Sized Brief, Construed as a Motion to Expand Certificate Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/23/2019. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:26 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed to Extend Time to File Certificate of Appealability until/for 30 days. Response due on 08/05/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/23/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:33 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for 15 Day Extension of Time to File Supplement Motion. Certificate of Service dated 09/06/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

Document filed by Appellant Salaudin Shaheed titled "Amendment by Adding". Certificate of Service dated 08/06/2019. Service made by US mail. [19-1441, 19-2632] (TMM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:34 AM]

Open Document #5

Standing Order

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed as it is unnecessary. It is noted that the docketing fee has been waived, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:46 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 09/05/2019 09:59 AM]

Open Document #6

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (MW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and certificate of interested parties on behalf of Appellant Salahudin Shaheed, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:30 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #4

caption

Open Document #2

DC Order 6/28/19

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) motion by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for extension of time to file application for certificate of appealability is granted. Appellant's application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. If Appellant does not file an application for a certificate of appealability by the deadline established. Appellant's notice of appeal will be deemed to be such an application and will be submitted by the Clerk of this Court to a panel of the Court for consideration, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:43 AM]

Open Document

Document received from Appellant titled "Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure". Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

Open Document #3

DC Memorandum 6/28/19

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for 15 Day Extension of Time to File Supplement Motion. Certificate of Service dated 09/06/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 09/10/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 09/05/2019 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for Permissiom to File Over Sized Brief, Construed as a Motion to Expand Certificate Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 08/23/2019. Service made by ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 08/23/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) no action will be taken on motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed as it is unnecessary. It is noted that the docketing fee has been waived, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/13/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Document filed by Appellant Salaudin Shaheed titled "Amendment by Adding". Certificate of Service dated 08/06/2019. Service made by US mail. [19-1441, 19-2632] (TMM) [Entered: 08/15/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Salahudin Shaheed requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form within 14 days. (TMM) [Entered: 08/08/2019 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and certificate of interested parties on behalf of Appellant Salahudin Shaheed, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/08/2019 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) motion by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed for extension of time to file application for certificate of appealability is granted. Appellant's application for a certificate of appealability must be filed within 30 days of the date of this order. If Appellant does not file an application for a certificate of appealability by the deadline established. Appellant's notice of appeal will be deemed to be such an application and will be submitted by the Clerk of this Court to a panel of the Court for consideration, filed. (TMM) [Entered: 08/01/2019 09:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed to Extend Time to File Certificate of Appealability until/for 30 days. Response due on 08/05/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/23/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 08/09/2019. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/30/2019 11:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (MW) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Document received from Appellant titled "Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure". Certificate of Service dated 07/08/2019. Service made by US mail. (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Salahudin Shaheed in District Court No. 2-15-cr-00187-002. (TMM) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.