This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/19/2020 at 05:27:44 (UTC).

USA v. Robert Hutchins, Jr.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Robert Hutchins, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2729

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ROBERT HUTCHINS, JR.

Henderson, KY 42419-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Robert Hutchins Jr.

Attorney at HENDERSON COUNTY DETENTION CENTER

380 Borax Drive, P.O. Box 979

Henderson, KY 42419-0000

Joseph M. Cleary

Attorney at INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS, INC.

111 Monument Circle

Indianapolis, IN 46204-0000

Sara J. Varner

Attorney at INDIANA FEDERAL COMMUNITY DEFENDERS, INC.

111 Monument Circle

Indianapolis, IN 46204-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Kristina Korobov

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: Appellant, on or before 10/02/2020, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. If appellant wishes to request an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal, appellant should file an appropriate motion in the district court, not this court, as soon as possible. Appellant's jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the status of any such motion. (See order for further details). DW [7109011] [7] [7109011] [20-2729] (MM) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:56 PM]

#6

(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [6] [7108346] [20-2729] (Moxley, David) [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:48 PM]

#5

(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sara J. Varner for Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [5] [7108031] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2729] [Edited 09/16/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Varner, Sara) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:45 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [4] [7108000] [20-2729] (Cleary, Joseph) [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:00 PM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. Yes. [3] [7107968] [20-2729]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by CG - to reflect that no prior proceeding was indicated within docketing statement.] (Cleary, Joseph) [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:37 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Defendant filed the appeal pro se in this criminal action although he was represented in the district court by attorneys Gwendolyn M. Beitz and Joseph M. Cleary. Counsel is reminded of the obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by court upon a motion to withdraw. DW [2] [7107487] [20-2729] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:35 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Criminal Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Appellant, on or before 10/02/2020, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. If appellant wishes to request an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal, appellant should file an appropriate motion in the district court, not this court, as soon as possible. Appellant's jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the status of any such motion. (See order for further details). DW [7109011] [7] [7109011] [20-2729] (MM) [Entered: 09/18/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [6] [7108346] [20-2729] (Moxley, David) [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Sara J. Varner for Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [5] [7108031] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [20-2729] [Edited 09/16/2020 by CG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Varner, Sara) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. [4] [7108000] [20-2729] (Cleary, Joseph) [Entered: 09/15/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Robert Hutchins, Jr.. Prior or Related proceedings: No. Yes. [3] [7107968] [20-2729]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by CG - to reflect that no prior proceeding was indicated within docketing statement.] (Cleary, Joseph) [Entered: 09/15/2020 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Defendant filed the appeal pro se in this criminal action although he was represented in the district court by attorneys Gwendolyn M. Beitz and Joseph M. Cleary. Counsel is reminded of the obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by court upon a motion to withdraw. DW [2] [7107487] [20-2729] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/14/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Robert Hutchins Jr. by 09/16/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 10/20/2020 for Robert Hutchins Jr.. Transcript information sheet due by 09/24/2020. [1] [7107016] [20-2729] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina M. Korobov