This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/12/2022 at 05:42:29 (UTC).

USA v. Rami Ghanem

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Rami Ghanem. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-50266

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

RAMI GHANEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Bram M. Alden

Annamartine Salick

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Benjamin Lee Coleman

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to all Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Attorney Appeals Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: 360 MONTHS. Transcript ordered by 12/01/2022. Transcript due 01/03/2023. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 02/09/2023 for Rami Ghanem. Appellee brief due 03/13/2023 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12585361] (ABT) [Entered: 11/10/2022 04:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less