This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/11/2022 at 21:17:49 (UTC).

USA v. Omar Gutierrez-Valle

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Omar Gutierrez-Valle. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2619

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

OMAR GUTIERREZ-VALLE

Aledo, IL 61231-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Omar Gutierrez-Valle

906 S.W. Third Street

Aledo, IL 61231-0000

Beau B. Brindley

53 W. Jackson Boulevard

Chicago, IL 60604

John K. Adams

Attorney at EIMER STAHL LLP

224 S. Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60604-2516

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Katherine Virginia Boyle

201 S. Vine Street

Urbana, IL 61802-0000

Grant Thomas Hodges

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1830 Second Avenue

Rock Island, IL 61201-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Mandate Issued

Open Document #2

Final judgment

Open Document #1

Nonprecedential Disposition

#45

(#45) Mandate issued. Entire record returned consisting of 1 box of jury trial exhibits. [45] [7185458] [20-2619] (SK) [Entered: 09/14/2021 09:58 AM]

#44

(#44) ORDER: Final judgment filed per nonprecedential disposition. With costs: no. [44] [7180765] [20-2619] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2021 11:11 AM]

#43

(#43) Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [43] [7180761] [20-2619] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2021 11:07 AM]

#37

(#37) ORDER: Counsel in this appeal shall present oral argument either telephonically or by video communications, unless the assigned panel orders otherwise. No attorneys will be present in the courtroom. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. MOTIONS TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT: If the appeal can be resolved based on the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument, see FED. R. APP. P. 34(a), counsel may file a motion under Circuit Rule 34(e) to waive oral argument. The court encourages counsel to confer with opposing counsel when considering a motion to waive oral argument and prefers joint motions. A motion to waive oral argument must be filed no later than seven days before the date of argument. CH [37] [7164754] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:37 PM]

#8

(#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7110388] [20-2619] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:53 AM]

#7

(#7) Docketing Statement filed by pro se Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7109679] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:07 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER: re: Request to extend. [ # 5 ] The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline for paying the docketing fee or filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to October 5, 2020. Attorney Beau B. Brindley is again reminded of his obligation to represent the defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). SCR [6] [7108915] [20-2619] (CG) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:30 AM]

#5

(#6) ORDER: re: Request to extend. [ # 5 ] The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline for paying the docketing fee or filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to October 5, 2020. Attorney Beau B. Brindley is again reminded of his obligation to represent the defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). SCR [6] [7108915] [20-2619] (CG) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:30 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle by 09/29/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 4017. [4] [7107645] [20-2619] (AD) [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:34 AM]

#3

(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. [3] [7106557] [20-2619] (AD) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:14 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER: Defendant filed the appeal pro se in this criminal action. Counsel is reminded of the obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by court upon a motion to withdraw for good cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the provisions of FRAP 10(b) regarding the preparation of the transcripts. Attorney Beau B. Brindley is advised that a copy of the Transcript Information Sheet submitted to the court reporter must be attached to the Status Report, signed by the court reporter and indicating the date the transcripts are expected to be completed. Status report due for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle by 09/08/2020. DW [2] [7104617] [20-2619] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:51 PM]

1 #4

Notice to District Court

1 #3

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Fee Notice

#1

Criminal Case

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOR COURT USE ONLY: Certified copy of 08/23/2021 Nonprecedential Disposition and Final judgment with Mandate sent to the District Court Clerk & U.S. Probation. [7185461-2] [7185461] [20-2619] (SK) [Entered: 09/14/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Mandate issued. Entire record returned consisting of 1 box of jury trial exhibits. [45] [7185458] [20-2619] (SK) [Entered: 09/14/2021 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER: Final judgment filed per nonprecedential disposition. With costs: no. [44] [7180765] [20-2619] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2021 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [43] [7180761] [20-2619] (ER) [Entered: 08/23/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#42) Case argued by John K. Adams for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle and Grant Thomas Hodges for Appellee USA. [42] [7171474] [20-2619] (DRS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#41) Case heard and taken under advisement by panel: Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Michael S. Kanne, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [41] [7171473] [20-2619] (DRS) [Entered: 07/07/2021 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#40) Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney Grant Thomas Hodges for Appellee USA. [40] [7169768] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 06/29/2021 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#39) Received argument confirmation per argument email form for Attorney John K. Adams for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. [39] [7169762] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 06/29/2021 09:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#38) Supplemental paper record on appeal filed. Contents of record : 1 box of jury trial exhibits. [38] [7169237] [20-2619] (SK) [Entered: 06/25/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER: Counsel in this appeal shall present oral argument either telephonically or by video communications, unless the assigned panel orders otherwise. No attorneys will be present in the courtroom. The clerks office will contact counsel with further instructions. MOTIONS TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT: If the appeal can be resolved based on the briefs and record and the decisional process would not be significantly aided by oral argument, see FED. R. APP. P. 34(a), counsel may file a motion under Circuit Rule 34(e) to waive oral argument. The court encourages counsel to confer with opposing counsel when considering a motion to waive oral argument and prefers joint motions. A motion to waive oral argument must be filed no later than seven days before the date of argument. CH [37] [7164754] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 06/03/2021 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed District Court order GRANTING Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Date IFP granted: 10/27/2020. [10] [7117716] [20-2619] (CG) [Entered: 10/27/2020 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#9) Notification from the District Court that a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is pending. [9] [7110789] [20-2619] (JR) [Entered: 09/28/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [8] [7110388] [20-2619] (ZNS) [Entered: 09/25/2020 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Docketing Statement filed by pro se Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [7] [7109679] [20-2619] (CAH) [Entered: 09/22/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: re: Request to extend. [ # 5 ] The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the deadline for paying the docketing fee or filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis is extended to October 5, 2020. Attorney Beau B. Brindley is again reminded of his obligation to represent the defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). SCR [6] [7108915] [20-2619] (CG) [Entered: 09/18/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle to extend time to file in forma pauperis form. [5] [7108280] [20-2619] (CAG) [Entered: 09/16/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle by 09/29/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0140 0000 6080 4017. [4] [7107645] [20-2619] (AD) [Entered: 09/15/2020 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. [3] [7106557] [20-2619] (AD) [Entered: 09/09/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Defendant filed the appeal pro se in this criminal action. Counsel is reminded of the obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by court upon a motion to withdraw for good cause. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the provisions of FRAP 10(b) regarding the preparation of the transcripts. Attorney Beau B. Brindley is advised that a copy of the Transcript Information Sheet submitted to the court reporter must be attached to the Status Report, signed by the court reporter and indicating the date the transcripts are expected to be completed. Status report due for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle by 09/08/2020. DW [2] [7104617] [20-2619] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/31/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle by 09/01/2020. Fee or IFP forms due on 09/09/2020 for Appellant Omar Gutierrez-Valle. Transcript information sheet due by 09/09/2020. [1] [7103905] [20-2619] (ZNS) [Entered: 08/27/2020 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grant Thomas Hodges

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Virginia Boyle