This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/30/2021 at 06:23:32 (UTC).

USA v. Nickolas Bryant

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Nickolas Bryant. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1170

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

NICKOLAS T. BRYANT

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

George F. Taseff

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

401 N. Main Street

Peoria, IL 61602-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Grant Thomas Hodges

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

1830 Second Avenue

Rock Island, IL 61201-0000

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Nickolas T. Bryant. [3] [7138097] [21-1170] (CG) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:47 AM]

#2

(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney Grant T. Hodges for Appellee USA. [2] [7138034] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1170] [Edited 01/29/2021 by CG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Hodges, Grant) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:54 AM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Criminal Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Nickolas T. Bryant. [3] [7138097] [21-1170] (CG) [Entered: 01/29/2021 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Appearance form filed by Attorney Grant T. Hodges for Appellee USA. [2] [7138034] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [21-1170] [Edited 01/29/2021 by CG to reflect the termination and addition of counsel.] (Hodges, Grant) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal case docketed. IFP. Docketing statement filed. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/09/2021 for Nickolas T. Bryant. Transcript information sheet due by 02/11/2021. [1] [7137849] [21-1170] (ZNS) [Entered: 01/28/2021 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grant Thomas Hodges