This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/09/2019 at 05:12:04 (UTC).

USA v. Nahtanha Herrera

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Nahtanha Herrera. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1368

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

NAHTANHA GARCIA HERRERA

Fort Worth, TX 76127-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Nahtanha Garcia Herrera

Attorney at FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER CARSWELL

P.O. Box 27137

Fort Worth, TX 76127-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Kristina Korobov

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Federal prisoner's F.R.Cr.P 35 case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 03/14/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Nahtanha Garcia Herrera by 03/05/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/09/2019 for Nahtanha Garcia Herrera. [1] [6988040] [19-1368] (FP) [Entered: 03/01/2019 12:14 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Federal prisoner's F.R.Cr.P 35 case docketed. IFP. Transcript information sheet due by 03/14/2019. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Nahtanha Garcia Herrera by 03/05/2019. Appellant's brief due on or before 04/09/2019 for Nahtanha Garcia Herrera. [1] [6988040] [19-1368] (FP) [Entered: 03/01/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina M. Korobov