This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:27 (UTC).

USA v. Michael Strausbaugh

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Michael Strausbaugh. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2606

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

MICHAEL STRAUSBAUGH

Fairton, NJ 08320

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Jennifer P. Wilson Esq.

227 High Street, P.O. Box 116

Duncannon, PA 17020

Michael Strausbaugh

Attorney at Fairton FCI

P.O. Box 420

Fairton, NJ 08320

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Daryl F. Bloom Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

228 Walnut Street, P.O. Box 11754, 220 Federal Building And Courthouse

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Michael Strausbaugh advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:20 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Michael Strausbaugh, filed. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:21 PM]

Open Document #3

District Court Order_052219

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daryl F. Bloom on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-2606] (DFB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:57 AM]

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

Open Document #4

Case_Caption

Open Document #5

Standing_Order_ Excess_ Pagination_010912

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jennifer P. Wilson on behalf of Appellant(s) Michael Strausbaugh. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:19 PM]

Open Document #6

Civil Counsel Habeas Letter

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Michael Strausbaugh for issuance of certificate of appealability. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:27 PM]

Open Document #2

District_Court _ Memorandum_052219

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (NF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:13 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Michael Strausbaugh for issuance of certificate of appealability. Certificate of Service dated 07/26/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Michael Strausbaugh, filed. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Michael Strausbaugh advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jennifer P. Wilson on behalf of Appellant(s) Michael Strausbaugh. [19-2606] (JPW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (NF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daryl F. Bloom on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-2606] (DFB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Michael Strausbaugh in District Court No. 1-11-cr-00096-001. (DW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.