This case was last updated from PACER on 04/13/2020 at 06:06:18 (UTC).

USA v. Melvin Shields

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Melvin Shields. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-15227

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

MELVIN RUSSELL "RUSTY" SHIELDS

Petersburg, VA 23804

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Melvin Russell "Rusty" Shields

Attorney at FCI - FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION - PETERSBURG

P.O. Box 1000

Petersburg, VA 23804

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Merry Jean Chan

Attorney at DOJ-USAO

450 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Maia Perez

Attorney at DOJ - Office of the U.S. Attorney

150 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 900

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Received Appellant Melvin Russell "Rusty" Shields notice of appeal. [11645644] (NAC) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:22 PM]

#2

(#2) Filed Appellant Melvin Russell "Rusty" Shields letter dated 02/20/2020 re: Rule 59-e motion to reconsider with district court. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11622770] (RR) [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:16 PM]

#1

(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 01/21/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11596537] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:55 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Received Appellant Melvin Russell "Rusty" Shields notice of appeal. [11645644] (NAC) [Entered: 03/30/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Appellant Melvin Russell "Rusty" Shields letter dated 02/20/2020 re: Rule 59-e motion to reconsider with district court. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11622770] (RR) [Entered: 03/09/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 01/21/2020. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11596537] (JBS) [Entered: 02/13/2020 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less