This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/29/2022 at 06:06:28 (UTC).

USA v. Linda Schrock

Case Summary

On 02/21/2013 USA filed an Other lawsuit against Linda Schrock. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-3194

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

LINDA SCHROCK

Amicus Curiae

THE LEADERSHIP CONFERENCE ON CIVIL AND HUMAN RIGHTS

AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE

CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS

NAACP

ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE

POLICE EXECUTIVE RESEARCH FORUM

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES

HINDU AMERICAN FOUNDATION

NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY

SIKH AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND

AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN

HUMAN RIGHTS CAMPAIGN

NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN

SIKH COALITION

HUMAN RIGHTS FIRST

NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK

SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas E. Chandler

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Bridget Meehan Brennan

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney

801 W. Superior Avenue, Suite 400

Cleveland, OH 44113

Steven M. Dettelbach

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

1900 E. Ninth Street, Suite 3200

Cleveland, OH 44114-3485

Dennis J. Dimsey

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Jessica Dunsay Silver

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 14403

Washington, DC 20044-4403

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Joseph A. Dubyak

Attorney at Law Office

50 Public Square, Suite 920

Cleveland, OH 44113

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

David M. Raim

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Lisa M. Bornstein

Attorney at The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights

1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20006

Joy L. Langford

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Kate McSweeny

Attorney at Chadbourne & Parke

1200 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20036-0000

Steven M. Freeman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Michael Lieberman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Seth Marnin

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

605 Third Street

New York, NY 10158

Miriam Zeidman

Attorney at Anti-Defamation League

120 S. Lasalle, Suite 1150

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#120

(#126) ORDER filed denying motion for release pending appeal [ # 120 ] filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge; Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., U.S. District Judge. (CLB) [Entered: 09/24/2014 07:52 AM]

#14

(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Susan Trischan. [14] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:07 AM]

#13

(#13) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. George Staiduhar. [13] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:06 AM]

#12

(#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Judith Gage. [12] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:04 AM]

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

pre-sentence report filed

#8

(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Bridget M. Brennan. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2013. (BMB) [Entered: 02/26/2013 10:42 AM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jessica Dunsay Silver. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (JDS) [Entered: 02/25/2013 04:03 PM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Thomas E. Chandler. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (TEC) [Entered: 02/25/2013 02:19 PM]

#1

(#1) Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Linda Schrock. Transcript needed: y. (CLB) [Entered: 02/21/2013 01:17 PM]

#109

RESTRICTED

#107

106 #2

Cover Letter

106 #1

judge order filed

#105

#104

#103

#102

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. George Charles Pappas for Emma Miller. Certificate of Service:06/03/2015. Argument Request: requested. [13-3182, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (FILED ON INCORRECT CASE)--[Edited 06/03/2015 by CB] (GCP) [Entered: 06/03/2015 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Docket(#134) CJA VOUCHER filed making claim for reimbursement. Voucher, [133] , filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak in 13-3194. (CJF) [Entered: 01/21/2015 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Docket(#133) CJA voucher issued to Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock. (CJF) [Entered: 01/01/2015 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (CLB) [Entered: 12/01/2014 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ORDER filed denying petition for en banc rehearing [ # 127 ] filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. Jeffrey S. Sutton and Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judges; and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., District Judge. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 11/20/2014 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) RESPONSE in opposition filed regarding a petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 127 ]; previously filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response from Attorney Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Appellant Eli M. Miller Certificate of Service:10/29/2014. [13-3201, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (JSG) [Entered: 10/29/2014 06:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) RESPONSE to petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 127 ], previously filed by filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler in 13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Response filed by Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr.. Certificate of service: 10/29/2014. [13-3205, 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (WLO) [Entered: 10/29/2014 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) LETTER SENT to Mr. David C. Jack for Lovina Miller, Mr. Michael E. Rosman for Kathryn Jean A. Miller, Mr. George Charles Pappas for Emma Miller, Mr. Kip Thomas Bollin for Anna Miller, Mr. Brian M. Pierce for Elizabeth Miller, Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock, Mr. Samuel George Amendolara for Daniel S. Mullet, Mr. Steven Richard Jaeger for Levi F. Miller, Mr. Robert E. Duffrin for Johnny S. Mullet, Mr. Damian A. Billak for Lester S. Mullet, Mr. J. Dean Carro for Lester M. Miller, Ms. Wendi L. Overmyer for Samuel Mullet, Sr., Mr. Wesley A. Dumas, Sr. for Raymond Miller, Mr. James Samuel Gentile for Eli M. Miller, Mr. Nathan A. Ray for Emanuel Schrock, Mr. Gary Howard Levine for Freeman Burkholder, notifying that they are directed to respond to petition for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler. Response due 10/29/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (BLH) [Entered: 10/15/2014 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Mr. Thomas E. Chandler for USA in 13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214. Certificate of Service: 10/10/2014. [13-3177, 13-3181, 13-3182, 13-3183, 13-3193, 13-3194, 13-3195, 13-3196, 13-3201, 13-3202, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207, 13-3208, 13-3214] (TEC) [Entered: 10/10/2014 06:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) ORDER filed denying motion for release pending appeal [ # 120 ] filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak. Jeffrey S. Sutton, Circuit Judge; Richard Allen Griffin, Circuit Judge and Edmund A. Sargus , Jr., U.S. District Judge. (CLB) [Entered: 09/24/2014 07:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Susan Trischan. [14] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Mr. George Staiduhar. [13] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Joseph A. Dubyak for Linda Schrock; transcript ordered on 03/08/2013 from Court Reporter Ms. Judith Gage. [12] Certificate of Service: 03/08/2013. (JAD) [Entered: 03/14/2013 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pre-sentence report filed. (KAL) [Entered: 03/05/2013 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Bridget M. Brennan. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2013. (BMB) [Entered: 02/26/2013 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Jessica Dunsay Silver. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (JDS) [Entered: 02/25/2013 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee USA by Thomas E. Chandler. Certificate of Service: 02/25/2013. (TEC) [Entered: 02/25/2013 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Docket(#3) LETTER SENT to extend appointment of Joseph Dubyak as counsel under the Criminal Justice Act for Linda Schrock. (CLB) [Entered: 02/21/2013 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Cheryl Borkowski (CLB) [Entered: 02/21/2013 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Linda Schrock. Transcript needed: y. (CLB) [Entered: 02/21/2013 01:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCIETY FOR HUMANISTIC JUDAISM is a litigant

Latest cases where POLICE EXECUTIVE RESEARCH FORUM is a litigant