This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 06:52:14 (UTC).

USA v. Justin Williams

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Justin Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1012

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

JUSTIN WILLIAMS, a//k/a New York Ice, a/k/a Pimp Juice

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Justin Williams

Attorney at Lewisburg USP

P.O. Box 1000

Lewisburg, PA 17837

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Laurie Magid Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Michelle Morgan Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

615 Chestnut Street, Suite 1250

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee USA to motion for bail pending appeal on habeas corpus. Certificate of Service dated 02/07/2019. [19-1012] (LM) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:40 PM]

Open Document

Supplement to Motion for Bail Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Justin Williams . Certificate of Service dated 02/03/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:50 PM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Williams for Bail Pending Appeal on Habeas Corpus. Certificate of Service dated 01/30/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:52 PM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion to extend time to file bail motion and supporting memorandum filed by Appellant. If no bail motion is filed on or before February 6, 2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute, filed. (KR) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:28 PM]

Open Document

LETTER MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Williams to Extend Time to File Motion for Bail. Response due on 01/25/2019. Certificate of Service dated 01/15/2019. Service made by ECF.--[Edited 01/18/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:27 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laurie Magid on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-1012] (LM) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:58 PM]

Open Document

LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT for Bail Pending Appeal on Habeas Corpus (MW) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:19 PM]

Open Document #4

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #3

Case Caption

Open Document #2

DC Order 121218

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellee USA to motion for bail pending appeal on habeas corpus. Certificate of Service dated 02/07/2019. [19-1012] (LM) [Entered: 02/07/2019 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplement to Motion for Bail Pending Appeal filed by Appellant Justin Williams . Certificate of Service dated 02/03/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 02/06/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) Appellee's Response to Appellant's Motion for Bail must be filed on or before February 11, 2019. (KR) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Williams for Bail Pending Appeal on Habeas Corpus. Certificate of Service dated 01/30/2019. Service made by US mail. (KR) [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion to extend time to file bail motion and supporting memorandum filed by Appellant. If no bail motion is filed on or before February 6, 2019, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute, filed. (KR) [Entered: 01/18/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER MOTION filed by Appellant Justin Williams to Extend Time to File Motion for Bail. Response due on 01/25/2019. Certificate of Service dated 01/15/2019. Service made by ECF.--[Edited 01/18/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laurie Magid on behalf of Appellee(s) United States of America. [19-1012] (LM) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT for Bail Pending Appeal on Habeas Corpus (MW) [Entered: 01/07/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Justin Williams in District Court No. 2-13-cr-00014-001. (KR) [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less