This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:29 (UTC).

USA v. Jose Corrales

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Jose Corrales. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-50651

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

JOSE LUIS CORRALES

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jeremy B. Gordon

Attorney at Jeremy Gordon, P.L.L.C.

1848 Lone Star Road

Mansfield, TX 76063

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Joseph H. Gay Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78216-5512

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy B. Gordon for Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:32 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 07/18/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:33 PM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Jose Luis Corrales. Brief in Support due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Jose Luis Corrales [19-50651] (AS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales [19-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:05 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9130459-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9130460-1] [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9130459-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon. [9130460-1] [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:30 AM]

Open Document

MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for certificate of appealability [9130459-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for certificate of appealability [9130459-2]. Date of service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:29 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102770-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9130459-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9130460-1] [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9130459-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon. [9130460-1] [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for certificate of appealability [9130459-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for certificate of appealability [9130459-2]. Date of service: 08/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/27/2019 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Jose Luis Corrales. Brief in Support due on 09/03/2019 for Appellant Jose Luis Corrales [19-50651] (AS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50651] (AS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeremy B. Gordon for Appellant Jose Luis Corrales in 19-50651 [19-50651] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:14-CR-491-1 4:18-CV-11. Electronic ROA due on 08/06/2019. [19-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102770-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [19-50651] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 07/18/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Gay; Attorney for Appellant: Gordon [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy B. Gordon for Mr. Jose Luis Corrales for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50651] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jose Luis Corrales [19-50651] (RAJ) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.