This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:22 (UTC).

USA v. Joe Guzman

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 USA filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Joe Guzman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10783

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

JOE GUZMAN, also known as Mike S. Aguirre

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jeremy B. Gordon

Attorney at Jeremy Gordon, P.L.L.C.

1848 Lone Star Road

Mansfield, TX 76063

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

James Wesley Hendrix

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

Leigha Amy Simonton

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1100 Commerce Street

Dallas, TX 75242-1699

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy B. Gordon for Mr. Joe Guzman for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:21 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102798-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10783] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:11 PM]

Open Document

PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman [19-10783] (CBW) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:10 PM]

Open Document

LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 09/04/2019 for Appellant Joe Guzman. Brief in Support due on 09/04/2019 for Appellant Joe Guzman. [19-10783] (SEP) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:29 PM]

Open Document

BRIEF IN SUPPORT in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9131533-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 08/28/2019. [9131534-1] [19-10783] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9131533-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gordon; Attorney for Appellee: Simonton. [9131534-1] [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 07:48 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for certificate of appealability [9131533-2]. Date of service: 08/28/2019 Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-10783] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman for certificate of appealability [9131533-2]. Date of service: 08/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gordon; Attorney for Appellee: Simonton [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 07:47 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEF IN SUPPORT in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9131533-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 08/28/2019. [9131534-1] [19-10783] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9131533-2 ]. Date of Service: 08/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gordon; Attorney for Appellee: Simonton. [9131534-1] [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 07:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for certificate of appealability [9131533-2]. Date of service: 08/28/2019 Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-10783] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman for certificate of appealability [9131533-2]. Date of service: 08/28/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gordon; Attorney for Appellee: Simonton [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 07:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeremy B. Gordon for Appellant Joe Guzman in 19-10783 [19-10783] (CB) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeremy B. Gordon for Mr. Joe Guzman for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-10783] (Jeremy B. Gordon ) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 09/04/2019 for Appellant Joe Guzman. Brief in Support due on 09/04/2019 for Appellant Joe Guzman. [19-10783] (SEP) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-10783] (SEP) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:19-CV-334. Electronic ROA due on 08/06/2019. [19-10783] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9102798-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-10783] (CCR) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joe Guzman [19-10783] (CBW) [Entered: 07/15/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less