This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/14/2022 at 05:04:44 (UTC).

USA v. Jimmy Deffenbaugh

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Jimmy Deffenbaugh. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1599

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

JIMMY DEFFENBAUGH

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Katherine Virginia Boyle

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

201 S. Vine Street

Urbana, IL 61802-0000

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Karl W. Bryning

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

401 N. Main Street

Peoria, IL 61602-0000

Jimmy Deffenbaugh

Attorney at FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION - FORT DIX

P.O. Box 2000

Joint Base Mdl, NJ 08640

 

Court Documents

#1

Criminal Case

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

1 #3

Notice to District Court

#2

(#2) ORDER: Appellant, on or before April 27, 2022, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7229544] DW [2] [7229544] [22-1599] (HTP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 12:55 PM]

#3

(#3) Motion filed by Attorney Karl W. Bryning for Appellant Jimmy Deffenbaugh to withdraw as counsel. [3] [7229580] [22-1599]--[Edited 04/13/2022 by AD to reflect attorney filer.] (Bryning, Karl) [Entered: 04/13/2022 02:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion filed by Attorney Karl W. Bryning for Appellant Jimmy Deffenbaugh to withdraw as counsel. [3] [7229580] [22-1599]--[Edited 04/13/2022 by AD to reflect attorney filer.] (Bryning, Karl) [Entered: 04/13/2022 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: Appellant, on or before April 27, 2022, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. (See order for further details). [7229544] DW [2] [7229544] [22-1599] (HTP) [Entered: 04/13/2022 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jimmy Deffenbaugh by 04/18/2022. Transcript information sheet due by 04/25/2022. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/23/2022 for Jimmy Deffenbaugh. [1] [7229256] [22-1599] (PS) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karl W. Bryning