This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/28/2021 at 05:09:44 (UTC).

USA v. Corey Monroe

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Corey Monroe. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-13714

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant / Appellant

COREY MONROE

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33310

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Emily M. Smachetti

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

99 Ne 4Th St

Miami, FL 33132

U.S. Attorney Service - Southern District of Florida

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Service - SFL

99 Ne 4Th St 5Th Fl

Miami, FL 33132-2111

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Daryl Elliott Wilcox

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Michael Caruso

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

1 E Broward Blvd Ste 1100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Corey Monroe

Attorney at Broward County Jail - Inmate Legal Mail

Po Box 9356

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33310

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Criminal Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #2

usdc Judgment #103

Open Document #3

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Corey Monroe. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Caruso for Corey Monroe. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:16 AM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:19 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 01:46 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 01:58 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [21-13714] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/27/2021 02:30 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Emily M. Smachetti for USA. [21-13714] (ECF: Emily Smachetti) [Entered: 10/27/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM SUBMITTED by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. Transcript(s) ordered. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Appellant Corey Monroe. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Michael Caruso for Corey Monroe. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Daryl Elliott Wilcox for Corey Monroe. [21-13714] (ECF: Daryl Wilcox) [Entered: 10/27/2021 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCRIMINAL EXPEDITED APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Corey Monroe on 10/21/2021. Fee Status: Fee Not Required. [Entered: 10/26/2021 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daryl Elliott Wilcox

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Caruso