This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/21/2020 at 05:07:30 (UTC).

USA v. Cordney Thurman

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 USA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Cordney Thurman. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1284

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

CORDNEY J. THURMAN

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Jane Corbett Hinton Ruemmele

Attorney at HAYES RUEMMELE LLC

22 E. Washington Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Kristina Korobov

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

Ten W. Market Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204-3048

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Appellant, on or before March 5, 2020, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. Appellant's jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the request for an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal filed with the district court on February 7, 2020. (See order for further details) DW [7063778] [6] [7063778] [20-1284] (PS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:10 PM]

#5

(#5) ORDER: Defendant filed his notice of appeal pro se in this criminal action although he was represented in the district court by attorney Jane Corbett Hinton Ruemmele. Counsel is reminded of her obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). DW [5] [7063776] [20-1284] (PS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:07 PM]

#4

(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. [4] [7063515] [20-1284] (Moxley, David) [Entered: 02/20/2020 07:09 AM]

#3

(#3) Docketing Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7063505] [20-1284]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by PS - to clarify document filed.] (Ruemmele, Jane) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:31 PM]

#2

(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jane H. Ruemmele for Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. [2] [7063500] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1284] (Ruemmele, Jane) [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:56 PM]

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Criminal Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Appellant, on or before March 5, 2020, shall file a brief memorandum stating why this appeal should not be dismissed because it is untimely. Briefing shall be SUSPENDED pending further court order. Appellant's jurisdictional memorandum should include a discussion of the request for an extension of time in which to file the notice of appeal filed with the district court on February 7, 2020. (See order for further details) DW [7063778] [6] [7063778] [20-1284] (PS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Defendant filed his notice of appeal pro se in this criminal action although he was represented in the district court by attorney Jane Corbett Hinton Ruemmele. Counsel is reminded of her obligation to represent defendant on appeal unless specifically relieved by this court upon a motion to withdraw. See Circuit Rule 51(a), (c). DW [5] [7063776] [20-1284] (PS) [Entered: 02/20/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. [4] [7063515] [20-1284] (Moxley, David) [Entered: 02/20/2020 07:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Docketing Statement of Jurisdiction filed by Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [3] [7063505] [20-1284]--[Edited 02/20/2020 by PS - to clarify document filed.] (Ruemmele, Jane) [Entered: 02/19/2020 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Jane H. Ruemmele for Appellant Cordney J. Thurman. [2] [7063500] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [20-1284] (Ruemmele, Jane) [Entered: 02/19/2020 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Criminal case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Cordney J. Thurman by 02/26/2020. Appellant's brief due on or before 03/30/2020 for Cordney J. Thurman. Transcript information sheet due by 03/04/2020. [1] [7063460] [20-1284] (ER) [Entered: 02/19/2020 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristina M. Korobov