This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

USA v. Christopher Vialva

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 USA filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against Christopher Vialva. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70019

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Christopher Andre Vialva

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michael W. Lieberman

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

215 Dean A. Mcgee Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Jared Tyler

Attorney at Tyler Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

P.O. Box 764

Houston, TX 77001

Susan M. Otto

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

215 Dean A. Mcgee Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph H. Gay Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78216-5512

Elizabeth Berenguer

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 N.W. Loop 410

San Antonio, TX 78216-5512

Robert Alton Parker Esq.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [20-70019 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JLD; denying Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [ # 9400013-3 ] [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:18 PM]

Open Document

SUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [9408329-2] was filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva on 09/21/2020. Supreme Court Number: 20-5766. [20-70019] (SBS) [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:22 PM]

Open Document #2

OPD-1 Opinion

Open Document

APPELLANT'S LETTER REPLY BRIEF FILED [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S LETTER REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva. Date of service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Jared Tyler ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:42 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Robert Alton Parker ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:07 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9401975-1] to the Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva in 20-70019 [ # 9400013-3 ] [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by USA [9401975-1] to the Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [ # 9400013-3 ] Date of Service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler. [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:48 AM]

Open Document

APPENDIX FILED [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPENDIX FILED by Appellee USA Date of Service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:43 AM]

Open Document

APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by USA. Date of service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:42 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #2

RE-5 Electronic Filers Letter

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

No Description Available

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Susan M. Otto for Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-70019] (Susan M. Otto ) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:45 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jared Tyler for Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Jared Tyler ) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:41 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9398714-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:11 AM]

Open Document

DEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 10:21 AM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT 30 voucher received from Mr. Jared Tyler for Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva. Timely? Yes. Counsel should allow a minimum of 30 days for processing before inquiring about payment status. [20-70019] (GMC) [Entered: 10/20/2020 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPREME COURT NOTICE that petition for writ of certiorari [9408329-2] was filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva on 09/21/2020. Supreme Court Number: 20-5766. [20-70019] (SBS) [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [20-70019 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: EHJ , Judge: JLD; denying Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [ # 9400013-3 ] [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Alton Parker for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 20-70019 [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/18/2020 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S LETTER REPLY BRIEF FILED [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S LETTER REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva. Date of service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Jared Tyler ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Robert Alton Parker ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9401975-1] to the Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva in 20-70019 [ # 9400013-3 ] [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by USA [9401975-1] to the Motion to stay execution filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [ # 9400013-3 ] Date of Service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler. [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX FILED [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPENDIX FILED by Appellee USA Date of Service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied [20-70019] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by USA. Date of service: 09/17/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Berenguer, Gay; Attorney for Appellants: Lieberman, Otto, Tyler [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/17/2020 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Susan M. Otto for Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-70019] (Susan M. Otto ) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jared Tyler for Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Jared Tyler ) [Entered: 09/15/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Michael W. Lieberman ) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Berenguer for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 20-70019 [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 6:04-CV-163 6:99-CR-70-1. Electronic ROA due on 09/29/2020. [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9398724-2] [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9398714-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-70019] (Elizabeth Berenguer ) [Entered: 09/14/2020 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9398626-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva. [9398626-1] [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEATH PENALTY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Christopher Andre Vialva [20-70019] (MRW) [Entered: 09/14/2020 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less