This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 05:41:44 (UTC).

USA v. Brittany Jones

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 USA filed an Other lawsuit against Brittany Jones. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3039

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

Brittany Jones, also known as Brittany Alleesse Nancy Jones

Plaintiff / Appellee

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Ernest W. McIntosh Esquire Jr.

Attorney at Newman & McIntosh, LLC

600 New Hampshire Avenue, Nw, Suite 610

Washington, DC 20037

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

USAO Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Elizabeth Trosman Esquire

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1844595] filed appointing counsel Ernest W. McIntosh Jr. for Brittany Jones in 20-3039. Directing party to file bail submissions: Completion of Transcripts due 06/08/2020. APPELLANT Memorandum of Law and Fact due 06/17/2020. APPELLEE Memorandum of Law and Fact due 06/29/2020. APPELLANT Reply Memorandum of Law and Fact due 07/06/2020 [20-3039] [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:36 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1844568] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cr-00307-RCL-2 filed by Brittany Jones. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-3039. [20-3039] [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:02 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1844595] filed appointing counsel Ernest W. McIntosh Jr. for Brittany Jones in 20-3039. Directing party to file bail submissions: Completion of Transcripts due 06/08/2020. APPELLANT Memorandum of Law and Fact due 06/17/2020. APPELLEE Memorandum of Law and Fact due 06/29/2020. APPELLANT Reply Memorandum of Law and Fact due 07/06/2020 [20-3039] [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1844568] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:19-cr-00307-RCL-2 filed by Brittany Jones. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-3039. [20-3039] [Entered: 05/28/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketBAIL/DETENTION CASE docketed. [20-3039] [Entered: 05/28/2020 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.