This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/05/2021 at 06:12:53 (UTC).

USA, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 USA filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Gavin Newsom. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-56304

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE GEO GROUP, INC.

Defendant / Appellees

GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of California

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Plaintiff / Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Amicus Curiae

MANAGEMENT & TRAINING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Gabrielle D. Boutin

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stephen Ehrlich

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 883, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Katherine Twomey Allen

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

10Th & Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Daniel Tenny

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Steven J. Wells Esquire

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

50 South 6Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Timothy J. Droske

Attorney at Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

50 South 6Th Street, Suite 1500

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#25

#13

#12

#11

10 #3

Additional Document

10 #2

Additional Document

10 #1

Main Document

#9

#6

#19

#17

#16

#2

1 #5

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11952372] (VS) [Entered: 01/05/2021 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • Docket(#24) Received 6 paper copies of Amicus Brief [ # 15 ] filed by Management & Training Corporation. [11949663] [20-56172, 20-56304] (SD) [Entered: 12/31/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 11937599-2 ] filed by The Geo Group, Inc. in 20-56172. [11949150] [20-56172, 20-56304] (SD) [Entered: 12/30/2020 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#22) Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 11937607-2 ] in 3 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellant The Geo Group, Inc. in 20-56172. [11949020] [20-56172, 20-56304] (LA) [Entered: 12/30/2020 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#21) Added Attorney(s) Steven J. Wells for party(s) Amicus Curiae Management & Training Corporation, in cases 20-56304 and 20-56172. [11948254] [20-56172, 20-56304] (QDL) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#20) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Steven J. Wells (Dorsey & Whitney LLP, 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402) for Amicus Curiae Management & Training Corporation in 20-56304. Date of service: 12/30/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11948246] [20-56172, 20-56304] (Wells, Steven) [Entered: 12/30/2020 08:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 11 ] filed by USA in 20-56304. [11947965] [20-56304, 20-56172] (SD) [Entered: 12/29/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Received 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 12 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant USA in 20-56304. [11947738] [20-56304, 20-56172] (KWG) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [ # 15 ] submitted by Management & Training Corporation is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11947288] [20-56172, 20-56304] (SML) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • Docket(#16) Entered appearance of Amicus Curiae Management & Training Corporation. [11947285] [20-56172, 20-56304] (SML) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Filed (ECF) Appellees State of California, Gavin Newsom and Xavier Becerra Joint Motion to consolidate cases 20-56172. Date of service: 12/15/2020. [11928502] [20-56304] (Boutin, Gabrielle) [Entered: 12/15/2020 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/28/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11926093] (VS) [Entered: 12/14/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#8) Added Attorney(s) Daniel Tenny for party(s) Appellant USA, in case 20-56304. [11923735] (CW) [Entered: 12/11/2020 07:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/11/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11923722]. [20-56304] (AD) [Entered: 12/11/2020 06:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellant USA Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/11/2020. [11923706] [20-56304] (Allen, Katherine) [Entered: 12/11/2020 06:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Room 7215, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellant USA. Date of service: 12/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11923704] [20-56304] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 12/11/2020 06:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#4) Attorney Stephen Ehrlich in 20-56304 substituted by Attorney Katherine Twomey Allen in 20-56304 [11920242] (CW) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katherine Twomey Allen (U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Washington, DC 20530) for Appellant USA. Substitution for Attorney Stephen Ehrlich for Appellant USA. Date of service: 12/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11920214] [20-56304] (Allen, Katherine) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed December 7, 2020, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than January 4, 2021; the answering brief is due February 1, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11918288] (AF) [Entered: 12/08/2020 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [11917693] (JBS) [Entered: 12/07/2020 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Management and Training Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy J. Droske

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J Wells