This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:00:29 (UTC).

US v. Namond Williams

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 US filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Namond Williams. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7031

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

NAMOND EARL WILLIAMS, a/k/a Namond Brewington, a/k/a Tony Smith

Fairton, NJ 08320-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

C. Justin Brown

Attorney at BROWN LAW

1 North Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Namond Earl Williams

Attorney at FCI FAIRTON

P. O. Box 420

Fairton, NJ 08320-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Ellen Elisabeth Cobb

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

6406 Ivy Lane

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Debra Lynn Dwyer

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

36 South Charles Street

Baltimore, MD 21201-0000

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER filed [1000569693] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 10/03/2019. Response brief due 11/04/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7031] CP [Entered: 08/19/2019 05:36 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION by Namond Earl Williams to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until October 3, 2019.. Date and method of service: 08/19/2019 ecf. [1000569652] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 08/19/2019 04:45 PM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Justin Brown for Namond Earl Williams. [1000562783] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:17 PM]

#14

(#14) SECOND DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Namond Earl Williams re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 08/12/2019 from C. Justin Brown. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:18 PM]

#13

(#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ellen E. Cobb for US. [1000554591] [19-7031] Ellen Cobb [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:25 AM]

#12

(#12) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Namond Earl Williams and US re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 07/29/2019 from C. Justin Brown, Ellen Elisabeth Cobb and Debra Lynn Dwyer, Assistant U. S. Attorney. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:34 PM]

#11

(#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/03/2019. Response Brief due 10/03/2019 [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:33 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER filed [1000554240] rescinding informal briefing. Copies to all parties. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:28 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER filed [1000554237] granting Motion to appoint/assign counsel [ # 4 ] C. Justin Brown for Namond Earl Williams in 19-7031. Nunc pro Tunc Date: 07/11/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Namond Williams. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:19 PM]

#6

(#6) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 08/02/2019 [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:48 AM]

#4

(#4) MOTION by Namond Earl Williams to appoint/assign counsel.. Date and method of service: 07/17/2019 ecf. [1000549116] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:28 PM]

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:27 AM]

#2

(#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Namond Williams. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:22 AM]

2 #1

NTC Re Appt Assgn Dist Ct Csl

#1

(#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:90-cr-00135-PWG-4. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/11/2019. Case manager: DLett. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:13 AM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER filed [1000569693] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 16 ] Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 10/03/2019. Response brief due 11/04/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-7031] CP [Entered: 08/19/2019 05:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION by Namond Earl Williams to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until October 3, 2019.. Date and method of service: 08/19/2019 ecf. [1000569652] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 08/19/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by C. Justin Brown for Namond Earl Williams. [1000562783] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 08/07/2019 05:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SECOND DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Namond Earl Williams re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 08/12/2019 from C. Justin Brown. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Ellen E. Cobb for US. [1000554591] [19-7031] Ellen Cobb [Entered: 07/26/2019 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Namond Earl Williams and US re: filing of appearance form. Appearance form due on 07/29/2019 from C. Justin Brown, Ellen Elisabeth Cobb and Debra Lynn Dwyer, Assistant U. S. Attorney. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 09/03/2019. Response Brief due 10/03/2019 [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER filed [1000554240] rescinding informal briefing. Copies to all parties. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER filed [1000554237] granting Motion to appoint/assign counsel [ # 4 ] C. Justin Brown for Namond Earl Williams in 19-7031. Nunc pro Tunc Date: 07/11/2019. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Namond Williams. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#8) SEALED district court document (court access only). Description of document: Presentencing Report.. Originating case number: 1:90-cr-00135-PWG-4,8:18-cv-1344-PWG. [19-7031] AD [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#7) SEALED district court document (court access only). Description of document: PSR. Originating case number: 1:90-cr-00135-PWG-4,8:18-cv-1344-PWG. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/23/2019 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD requested from Clerk of Court Due: 08/02/2019 [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • (#5) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:90-cr-00135-PWG-4,8:18-cv-1344-PWG. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? No. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Namond Earl Williams to appoint/assign counsel.. Date and method of service: 07/17/2019 ecf. [1000549116] [19-7031] C. Brown [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/30/2019. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Namond Williams. Informal Opening Brief due 08/09/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:90-cr-00135-PWG-4. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/11/2019. Case manager: DLett. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7031] DL [Entered: 07/16/2019 11:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.