This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2020 at 05:36:44 (UTC).

US v. Mohsin Raza

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 US filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Mohsin Raza. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6000

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

MOHSIN RAZA

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Charles Burnham

Attorney at BURNHAM & GOROKHOV PLLC

1424 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Gregory David Stefan

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

8000 World Trade Center, 101 West Main Street

Norfolk, VA 23510-1624

Joseph Anthony Capone

Attorney at FEDERAL HOUSING FINANCE AGENCY

400 7Th Street, Sw

Washington, DC 20024

Karen Ledbetter Taylor

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

Jack Hanly

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

Christine Nicole Roushdy

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

2100 Jamieson Avenue

Alexandria, VA 22314-5194

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. Charles Burnham - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/03/2020. Originating case number: 1:15-cr-00118-CMH-1. [20-6000] JR [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:52 AM]

3 #2

Preliminary informal briefing order

#1

(#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cr-00118-CMH-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/23/2019. Case manager: JRice. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6000] JR [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:45 AM]

3 #1

Notice to district court counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 01/27/2020 [20-6000] JR [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FEE NOTICE issued to Mr. Charles Burnham - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/03/2020. Originating case number: 1:15-cr-00118-CMH-1. [20-6000] JR [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cr-00118-CMH-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 12/23/2019. Case manager: JRice. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [20-6000] JR [Entered: 01/02/2020 08:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.