This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 06:01:57 (UTC).

US v. Jack Sporich

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 US filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Jack Sporich. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6014

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Respondent

JACK LOUIS SPORICH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Genna Danelle Petre

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601

Michael Bredenberg

Attorney at BUREAU OF PRISONS

Legal Department, Old Highway 75, P. O. Box 1600

Butner, NC 27509-0000

Respondent Attorneys

Katherine Elaine Shea

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

G. Alan DuBois

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Jaclyn Lee DiLauro

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

Jennifer Claire Leisten

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER

150 Fayetteville Street

Raleigh, NC 27601-0000

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Jack Louis Sporich. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Volume II of Joint Appendix (UNDER SEAL). [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:24 PM]

#2

(#2) ORDER filed appointing/assigning counsel. Office of the Federal Public Defender for Jack Louis Sporich in 20-6014. Copies to all parties.[1000654390] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:25 PM]

#16

(#16) MOTION by US to dismiss appeal [16]. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000691810] [20-6014] Genna Petre [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:39 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-hc-02061-D. Case manager: RSewell. [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:22 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER filed granting Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 6 ] Is oral argument requested: Yes; administratively terminating Motion to expedite decision [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [1000664273] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:30 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Jack Louis Sporich to accelerate case processing. , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 01/16/2020 ecf. [1000664116] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:59 PM]

#10

(#10) BRIEF by Jack Louis Sporich in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/06/2020. [1000678151] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:21 PM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer C. Leisten for Jack Louis Sporich. [1000664107] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:48 PM]

#3

(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:17-hc-02061-D.. [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:29 PM]

#9

(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Genna D. Petre for US. [1000666889] [20-6014] Genna Petre [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:51 AM]

#5

(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jack Louis Sporich. [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:50 PM]

#11

(#11) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Jack Louis Sporich. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/06/2020. [1000678156] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:22 PM]

#8

(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/06/2020. Response Brief due 02/27/2020 [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:53 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION by US to dismiss appeal [16]. Date and method of service: 02/27/2020 ecf. [1000691810] [20-6014] Genna Petre [Entered: 02/27/2020 09:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [ # 11 ] by Jack Louis Sporich. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [2]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [113]. Total number of sealed volumes: 1. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/07/2020. [1000685922] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [ # 10 ] by Jack Louis Sporich. Number of pages: [24]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 02/07/2020. [1000685914] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 02/19/2020 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#13) SEALED JOINT APPENDIX VOLUME(S) (court access only) (electronic & paper form) by Jack Louis Sporich. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 02/06/2020.. Filed Ex parte: N. [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Jack Louis Sporich. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Volume II of Joint Appendix (UNDER SEAL). [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by Jack Louis Sporich. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/06/2020. [1000678156] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF by Jack Louis Sporich in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/06/2020. [1000678151] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 02/06/2020 12:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Genna D. Petre for US. [1000666889] [20-6014] Genna Petre [Entered: 01/22/2020 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 02/06/2020. Response Brief due 02/27/2020 [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed granting Motion to accelerate case processing [ # 6 ] Is oral argument requested: Yes; administratively terminating Motion to expedite decision [ # 6 ] Copies to all parties. [1000664273] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/16/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Jack Louis Sporich to accelerate case processing. , to expedite decision. Date and method of service: 01/16/2020 ecf. [1000664116] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Jack Louis Sporich. [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer C. Leisten for Jack Louis Sporich. [1000664107] [20-6014] Jennifer Leisten [Entered: 01/16/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 5:17-hc-02061-D.. [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER filed appointing/assigning counsel. Office of the Federal Public Defender for Jack Louis Sporich in 20-6014. Copies to all parties.[1000654390] [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:17-hc-02061-D. Case manager: RSewell. [20-6014] RHS [Entered: 01/02/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less