This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:16 (UTC).

US v. Daniel Stone

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 US filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against Daniel Stone. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7022

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

DANIEL AARON STONE

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Daniel Aaron Stone

Attorney at UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY MARION

P. O. Box 1000

Marion, IL 62959-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Justin William Holloway

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY

401 West Evans Street

Florence, SC 29501-0000

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:54 AM]

#1

(#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 4:06-cr-00474-RBH-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/08/2019. Case manager: RSewell. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:52 AM]

#3

(#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:59 AM]

#5

(#5) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Daniel Aaron Stone. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:57 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Daniel Aaron Stone. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • (#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 4:06-cr-00474-RBH-1. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? Yes. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/17/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 07/29/2019. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019 [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) 2255 case docketed. Originating case number: 4:06-cr-00474-RBH-1. Date notice of appeal filed: 07/08/2019. Case manager: RSewell. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [19-7022] RHS [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.